Bauer et al v. Generac Power Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Matthew Bauer and Rebecca Bauer
Defendant: Generac Power Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv03230
Filed: December 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline M DeLuca
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS - WebEx. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (ADB)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/21/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (ADB)
January 23, 2025 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Generac Power Systems, Inc. (Crouse, Jarrod)
January 2, 2025 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Nicole J. Luhm on behalf of Defendant Generac Power Systems, Inc..(Luhm, Nicole)
December 17, 2024 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (RMR)
December 17, 2024 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Generac Power Systems, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(RMR)
December 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Generac Power Systems from District Court of Lancaster County, Case number 24-3767 ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5218755) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jarrod P. Crouse on behalf of Generac Power Systems(Crouse, Jarrod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauer et al v. Generac Power Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bauer
Represented By: Vincent M. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Bauer
Represented By: Vincent M. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generac Power Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole J. Luhm
Represented By: Jarrod P. Crouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?