Cook v. Regional Care, Inc.
Plaintiff: Leslie Cook
Defendant: Regional Care, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv03240
Filed: December 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Counsel for Defendant has now entered an appearance in these related cases. Plaintiffs have filed a Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel. See Filing No. 5 in Case No. 4:24-cv-03236-JMG-MDN. Any response to that motion shall be filed by February 18, 2025, after which the motion will be deemed fully submitted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
February 3, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney A. Victor Rawl, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Regional Care, Inc. (Rawl, A.)
January 21, 2025 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Regional Care, Inc. on 1/14/2025. (Ferich, Andrew)
January 10, 2025 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Regional Care, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
January 10, 2025 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Regional Care, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Ferich, Andrew)
December 31, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Andrew W. Ferich has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (RMR)
December 31, 2024 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (RMR)
December 31, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Regional Care, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5224752), by Attorney Andrew W. Ferich on behalf of LESLIE COOK (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ferich, Andrew)
December 31, 2024 Remark - Public (Related Case): This notice serves to advise the parties that a plaintiff noted this case as related to another pending or closed case in this court. If a case is noted as related on the cover sheet or case opening screen when filed, the clerk assigns it to the district judge who handled the earlier pending or closed case. See NEGenR 1.4(a)(4)(B). Any challenge to operation of this rule must be made pursuant to NEGenR 1.4(a)(7). (RMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Regional Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Cook
Represented By: Andrew W. Ferich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Care, Inc.
Represented By: A. Victor Rawl, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?