Stockmens Bank v. Bosle
Plaintiff: Stockmens Bank
Defendant: Zachary Bosle individually and doing business as Hastings Ag
Case Number: 4:2025cv03009
Filed: January 13, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Ryan C Carson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Conversion
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS - WebEx. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (MKR)
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 3/31/2025.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (MKR)
February 28, 2025 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Zachary Bosle (Adam, Jordan)
February 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Zachary Bosle shall have until February 28, 2025 to file an answer or other responsive pleading as to Plaintiff's Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (KNH)
February 6, 2025 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Jordan W. Adam on behalf of Defendant Zachary Bosle.(Adam, Jordan)
February 6, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Jordan W. Adam on behalf of Defendant Zachary Bosle (Adam, Jordan)
February 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Based on the recusal of Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca in related cases 4:25CV3004 and 4:25CV3005, and for purposes of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MKR)
January 24, 2025 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Zachary Bosle on 1/17/2025. (O'Brien, John)
January 15, 2025 Remark - Public: (Related Case): This notice serves to advise the parties that Chief Judge Rossiter noted this case is related to case 4:25cv3003. (DKM)
January 14, 2025 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney John O'Brien on behalf of Plaintiff Stockmens Bank.(O'Brien, John)
January 13, 2025 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Zachary Bosle. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
January 13, 2025 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Stockmens Bank. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
January 13, 2025 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Susan M. Bazis and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
January 13, 2025 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (O'Brien, John)
January 13, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zachary Bosle, individually and doing business as Hastings Ag ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5232081), by Attorney John O'Brien on behalf of Stockmens Bank (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(O'Brien, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stockmens Bank v. Bosle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stockmens Bank
Represented By: Shilee T. Mullin
Represented By: John O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Bosle individually and doing business as Hastings Ag
Represented By: Jordan W. Adam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?