Gerdes et al v. Kittelmann et al
Case Number: 7:2006cv05002
Filed: January 23, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 7 North Platte Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 7604 Clear Air Act (Emission Standards)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER regarding Statement 49 The Clerk of Court is authorized to pay $4,174.75 to Howard Olsen, Jr. for his fees and expenses incurred as Special Master in this matter. Further, the Clerk of Court shall distribute equally between the parties the remaining funds held by it, plus interest, and less the fee authorized by NECivR 67.1(c) and any pending court costs. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy to Financial) (TEL)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt Citation and Enforcement of Settlement Agreement 26 is denied. The Parties' requests for attorney fees are denied. Mr. Olson shall provide the Court with a statement for services rendered. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JAE)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER regarding Filings 43 and 44 . The parties have fourteen days (14 days) from the date of this order to respond to the report of Mr. Olsen and to make suggestions as to how the court should proceed in this matter. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (GJG)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER regarding Order 41 . The court finds Special Master Olsen should be granted an exemption from fees imposed by the Judicial Conference's Electronic Public Access fee schedule. This exemption applies only to the electronic case files of th is court that are available through the PACER system. Special Master Olsen's exemption applies only to electronic access to case files in this case. Special Master Olsen agrees that he will not transfer or sell for profit the data obtained as t he result of a fee exemption. This exemption is valid for the duration of this case and during any appeal, but the court may revoke Special Master Olsen's exemption at any time. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed as directed) (TEL)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER - This matter is before the court sua sponte. The court supplements its previous order of nominated special masters (Filing No. 37 ) to include Mr. Mattoon's partner, Donald J. B. Miller. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - This matter came on for hearing on the plaintiff's motion for Contempt Citation and Enforcement of Settlement Agreement, Filing No. 26 . The court finds that a special master is best suited to conduct this inquiry and to submit a recom mendation to the court. The court instructs the parties that on or before March 18, 2011, the plaintiffs and defendants must advise the court which of the three nominees they prefer and to which nominee(s) they object. The court will then appoint one of the three nominees special master. The parties are required to pay into the court on or before April 1, 2011, sufficient funds to compensate the special master. The court orders the plaintiffs and the defendants to pay into the clerk of court the total sum of $5,000.00. The plaintiffs, as a group, are ordered to pay $2,500.00 toward this total sum. The defendants, as a group, are ordered to pay $2,500.00 towards this total sum. The court will hold these funds for payment to th e special master. Any excess funds will be equally returned to the respective group of plaintiffs and defendants. The clerk of court is ordered to hold said sums in an interest-bearing account until further order of the court. Case Management Deadline set for 4/1/2011.Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (GJG)(Copy to Financial)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerdes et al v. Kittelmann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?