Sandoval v. Ross et al
Plaintiff: Guardian John Sandoval
Defendant: Larry Ross, Rosemarie Ross and Taco Town, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2010cv05003
Filed: May 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 7 North Platte Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT AMENDED BRIEF - This matter comes before the Court on the defendants' Motion for Leave to Submit Amended Brief (filing 110 ). The defendants' motion is granted. The defendants may sub mit an amended brief in opposition to the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (filing 83 ) on or before March 6, 2012, and the plaintiff may file a reply brief in support of her motion for summary judgment on or before March 13, 2012. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - After conferring with the parties, and with their approval:The defendant's Motion to Change Commencement Trial Date, (filing no. 99 ), is granted. The trial of this case is set to commence before the Honorable John M. Gerrard at 9:00 a.m. on May 21, 2012, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of five (5) trial days, in the North Platte Courtroom, Federal Bldg, US Post Office & Courthouse, 300 E 3rd St, North Platte, Nebraska. T he defendant's Motion to Require Designations of Testimony and Discovery, (filing no. 105 ), is granted. The parties' joint oral motion to continue the discovery deadline, (filing no. 109 ), is granted. Discovery shall be completed on or before April 1, 2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE - The plaintiff's motion 88 is granted. The plaintiff may submit the evidence in question to the clerk of this Court on or before February 22, 2012. The Court notes that briefing on the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment (filings 74 and 83 ) is complete except for the plaintiff's reply brief in support of her cross-motion for summary judgment. This Court will deem these motions ripe for disposition upon receipt of the plaintiff's reply brief and supplemental evidence, unless the parties, in light of the plaintiff's supplemental evidence, seek leave to amend their previous briefs. Such amendment, if necessary, should be sought by appropriate motion. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 69 Motion for Protective Order; adopting 70 Stipulation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoval v. Ross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemarie Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Town, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guardian John Sandoval
Represented By: Maren L. Chaloupka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?