Midwest Renewable Energy v. Western Biomass Energy et al
Plaintiff: Midwest Renewable Energy
Defendant: KL Energy Corp., KL Process Design Group LLC, Randall P. Kramer and Western Biomass Energy
Case Number: 7:2011cv05009
Filed: August 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 7 North Platte Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that plaintiff's motion to dismiss 62 is granted; this action is dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER that the plaintiff shall advise the Court, in writing, on or before March 1, 2016: 1) The status of the bankruptcy proceedings. 2) Whether plaintiff intends to proceed against the parties not in bankruptcy, while the case is stayed as to the party in bankruptcy. 3) If the bankruptcy proceedings have been terminated, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER regarding Status Report 58 filed by Midwest Renewable Energy. It is ordered that the plaintiff shall advise the Court, in writing, on or before January 1, 2016, as to the status of the bankruptcy proceedings and whether plaintiff intends to proceed against the parties not in bankruptcy, while the case is stayed as to the party in bankruptcy, or intends to wait until relief from the automatic stay is requested and obtained from the Nevada bankruptcy Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF) Modified on 12/2/2015 to include mailing to pro se party (KLF).
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that the plaintiff shall advise the Court, in writing, on or before June 1, 2015, as to the status of the bankruptcy proceedings and whether plaintiff intends to proceed against the parties not in bankruptcy, while the case is stayed as to the party in bankruptcy, or intends to wait until relief from the automatic stay is requested and obtained from the Nevada bankruptcy Court. ( Case Management Deadline set for 6/1/2015.) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MLF, )
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER that the plaintiff shall advise the Court, in writing, on or before December 1, 2014, as to the status of the bankruptcy proceedings and whether plaintiff intends to proceed against the parties not in bankruptcy, while the case is stayed as to the party in bankruptcy or intends to wait until relief from the automatic stay is requested and obtained from the Nevada bankruptcy Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Terrance O. Waite, Angela M. Franz and the law firm of Waite, McWha & Heng are deemed withdrawn as counsel of record for KL Energy Corp., KL Process Design Group, and Western Biomass Energy, LLC. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER that the plaintiff shall advise the Court, in writing, on or before June 6, 2014, as to the status of the bankruptcy proceedings and whether plaintiff intends to proceed against the parties not in bankruptcy, while the case is stayed as to the party in bankruptcy or intends to wait until relief from the automatic stay is requested and obtained from the Nevada bankruptcy Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The reference of adversary proceeding A12-4028 is withdrawn from the bankruptcy court. Plaintiff's counsel shall advise the Court, in writing, on or before October 18, 2013, whether it intends to proceed against the parties not in bankruptcy, while the case is stayed as to the party in bankruptcy or intends to wait until relief from the automatic stay is requested and obtained from the Nevada bankruptcy Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Pursuant to NEGenR 1.5(a)(1) and 28 U.S.C. § 157, this case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. This case shall be stayed as to defendants KL Process and KL Energy. The Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska shall furnish the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate a conference call with the undersigned judge on June 7, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. at which time the plaintiff and the remaining defendant, Randall P. Kramer, will inform the court how they intend to proceed with this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's counsel will contact defendant Kramer's South Dakota counsel in the companion case to determine how this court should proceed with scheduling a settlement conference. The settlement conf erence in this case is continued pending receipt of further information from plaintiff's counsel and an additional scheduling order from this court. Defendant KL Energy Corporation shall file a Suggestion of Bankruptcy in this case, and shall immediately advise this court if the bankruptcy stay for this litigation is lifted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The reference of adversary proceeding A12-4097 is withdrawn from the bankruptcy court pursuant to NELR 76.1(b)(1). Plaintiff's counsel shall initial a conference call with Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken on: Thur sday, February 28, 2013, at 10:30 a.m. Telephone number: (402) 661-7343 -- at which time the plaintiff and the remaining defendants shall advise the Court how they intend to proceed with this action. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Pursuant to NEGenR 1.5(a)(1) and 28 U.S.C. § 157, this case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. This case shall be terminated for statistical purposes by the Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska. The Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska shall furnish the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - IT IS ORDERED: The parties' Stipulation for Continuance (Filing No. 28 ) is adopted to the extent the February 1, 2012, Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of Case (Filing No. 16 ) is amended as set forth in this Order. The Final Pretrial Conference with the undersigned magistrate judge is set for April 15, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. C.D.T. by telephone. Trial is set to commence May 13, 2013, in North Platte, Nebraska, before the Honorable Lyle E. Strom and a jury. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midwest Renewable Energy v. Western Biomass Energy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KL Energy Corp.
Represented By: David P. Broderick
Represented By: Patrick M. Heng
Represented By: Terrance O. Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KL Process Design Group LLC
Represented By: David P. Broderick
Represented By: Patrick M. Heng
Represented By: Terrance O. Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall P. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Biomass Energy
Represented By: David P. Broderick
Represented By: Patrick M. Heng
Represented By: Terrance O. Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Renewable Energy
Represented By: Jerrold L. Strasheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?