Gering v. Deutsche

Defendant: Danny Deutsche
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gering
Case Number: 7:2013cv05009
Filed: September 13, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 7 North Platte Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2015 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting 123 Stipulation for Dismissal. All remaining parties and causes of action herein are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees incurred. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
July 16, 2015 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before August 17, 2015, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft ord er which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Absent compliance with this order, this case (inclu ding all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The previously scheduled pretrial conference and trial are cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. The defendants motion in limine (Filing No. 107 ) is terminated as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MLF, )
May 28, 2015 116 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE granting in part 100 Motion to Continue. Deposition deadline 8/17/15; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2015 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial set for 10/26/2015 at 08:30 AM in Lincoln County Courthouse, 301 N. Jeffers St., North Platte, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
December 19, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The defendant's Motion to Resolve Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Subpoena (Filing No. 55 ) is granted. The court sustains the plaintiffs' objections for the reasons stated above. The defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Evidence (Filing No. 65 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL)
October 29, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's Supplemental Expert Witness Disclosure and Proposed Expert Witnesses 40 and granting, in part, the defendant's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order 45 as set forth herein. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
August 5, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Stipulation to Extend Dates. A telephone planning conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on January 15, 2015, at 10:00 a.m., for the purpose of reviewing the preparation of the case to date and the sched uling of the case to trial. All other deadlines in the April 4, 2014, progression order are hereby suspended and the pretrial conference and trial settings are canceled and will be rescheduled during the January 15, 2015, planning conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
May 23, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Attorney Patrick Connealy has a pending case in this court and has not paid the 2013/2014 Attorney Assessment. Within 30 days from the date of this order, Mr. Connealy is directed to pay the $20.00 fee or show cause why he is unable to do so. Show Cause Deadline set for 6/23/2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MTB)
April 24, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The R&R (Filing No. 24 ) is adopted in its entirety. The plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment (Filing No. 14 ) is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gering v. Deutsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Deutsche
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gering
Represented By: Patrick M. Connealy
Represented By: Amy L. Patras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?