Monjo v. Ead Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Benny Monjo
Defendant: Ead Properties, LLC, Axcenture Construction and Axcenture Construction, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv05009
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/21/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Counterclaim of Defendant EAD Properties, LLC, by Benny Monjo (Ridgeway, Nicholas)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney James C. Bocott on behalf of Defendant Axcenture Construction, LLC.(Bocott, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Terrance O. Waite on behalf of Defendant Ead Properties, LLC.(Waite, Terrance)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Benny Monjo regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 filed by Axcenture Construction, LLC, Ead Properties, LLC by Ead Properties, LLC (Waite, Terrance) Modified on 8/30/2019 to reflect counterclaim is against Benny Monjo (ADB).
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Nicholas J. Ridgeway has not registered for the system or paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney James C. Bocott has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Axcenture Construction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Ead Properties, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Axcenture Construction (Bocott, James)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Ead Properties, LLC, Axcenture Construction from District Court of Lincoln County Nebraska, Case number CI19-348 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3997165) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Terrance O. Waite on behalf of Ead Properties, LLC, Axcenture Construction(Waite, Terrance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monjo v. Ead Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ead Properties, LLC
Represented By: Terrance O. Waite
Represented By: Margaret R. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axcenture Construction
Represented By: James C. Bocott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axcenture Construction, LLC
Represented By: James C. Bocott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Monjo
Represented By: Nicholas R. Norton
Represented By: Nicholas J. Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?