Trimble v. Helwig et al
Plaintiff: Cleve Trimble
Defendant: Ben Helwig and Wildlife Outdoor Productions LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv05015
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Wildlife Outdoor Productions LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Attorney Erik W. Fern on behalf of Defendant Wildlife Outdoor Productions LLC (Fern, Erik)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Ben Helwig. Waiver sent on 12/10/2019. (Sanford, Steven)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Wildlife Outdoor Productions LLC. Waiver sent on 12/10/2019. (Sanford, Steven)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons [Wildlife Outdoor Productions LLC] by Attorney Steven W. Sanford on behalf of Plaintiff Cleve Trimble (Sanford, Steven)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Ben Helwig and Wildlife Outdoor Productions LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Wildlife Outdoor Productions LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (Sanford, Steven)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Ben Helwig regarding Complaint, #1 . (Sanford, Steven)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Ben Helwig and Wildlife Outdoor Productions LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4072346), by Attorney Steven W. Sanford on behalf of Cleve Trimble (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - real property in Cherry County, NE, #2 Exhibit B - portions from www.wildop.com)(Sanford, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trimble v. Helwig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Helwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wildlife Outdoor Productions LLC
Represented By: Erik W. Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleve Trimble
Represented By: Steven W. Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?