Schneider v. USA
Plaintiff: William Schneider, David Schwaninger and Dewane Spilker
Defendant: United States of America
Interested Party: California Farm Bureau Federation, Colorado Farm Bureau, Idaho Farm Bureau Federation, Indiana Farm Bureau, Iowa Farm Bureau Federation, Maine Farm Bureau, Maryland Farm Bureau, Nebraska Agricultural Legal Foundation, Inc., Nebraska Farm Bureau Federation, New Hampshire Farm Bureau Federation, New Jersey Farm Bureau, New Mexico Farm and Livestock Bureau, Ohio Farm Bureau Federation, Utah Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Federation, West Virginia Farm Bureau, Wisconsin Farm Bureau Federation and Wyoming Farm Bureau Federation
Intervenor Defendant: Rails-to-Trails
Case Number: 8:1999cv00315
Filed: May 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1491 Tucker Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on the parties' Notice and Stipulation of Dismissal (Filing No. 546 ). The Court being advised in the premises finds that such an Order is proper. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this action be dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER - The Court will order that the payments be made by June 7, 2021. Failure to make these payments will result in possible sanctions, as requested by the plaintiff. To ensure timely payment, hearing in this matter is hereby set before the undersigned on June 11, 2021 at 3:30 PM. Counsel for the parties shall be present for the hearing. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER - The deadline for the parties to electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation), excluding the issue of attorneys' fees, remains November 13, 2020. The parties shall notify the Court on or before December 8, 2020, as to whether they have resolved the issue of attorneys' fees. If the parties do not reach an agreement, Plaintiffs are given leave to file a motion for attorneys' fees on December 18, 2020. Defendant may file a response to the motion on or before January 15, 2021. Plaintiffs may file a reply on January 22, 2021, after which the motion will be fully submitted to the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 510 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that the plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on an incentive award (Filing No. 493 ) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this motion. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 509 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that the defendant's motion for summary judgment (Filing No. 490 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 460 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF A CASE - Jury Trial set for 12/9/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER that Attorney Cecilia Fex has a pending case in this court and has not paid the 2013/2014 Attorney Assessment. Within 30 days from the date of this order, Ms. Fex is directed to pay the $20.00 fee or show cause why she is unable to do so. Show Cause Deadline set for 6/27/2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MTB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: California Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Colorado Farm Bureau
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Idaho Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Indiana Farm Bureau
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Iowa Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Maine Farm Bureau
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Maryland Farm Bureau
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Agricultural Legal Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: W. Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: W. Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: New Hampshire Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: New Jersey Farm Bureau
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: New Mexico Farm and Livestock Bureau
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ohio Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Utah Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Virginia Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: West Virginia Farm Bureau
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Wisconsin Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Wyoming Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Rails-to-Trails
Represented By: Richard A. Allen
Represented By: Cornish F. Hitchcock
Represented By: S. Douglas MacKay
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Represented By: Robert A. DeHaan
Represented By: Christopher J. Beutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Schneider
Represented By: Andrew W. Cohen
Represented By: Cecilia Fex
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: John T. Conlee
Represented By: John E. Foulston
Represented By: Glen F. Koontz
Represented By: James R. Baarda
Represented By: Steven H. Kaminski
Represented By: Daniel S. Kozma
Represented By: Roger C. Johnson
Represented By: John B. Massopust
Represented By: Daniel J. Millea
Represented By: Henry J. Price
Represented By: Nels J. Ackerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Schwaninger
Represented By: Andrew W. Cohen
Represented By: Cecilia Fex
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: Daniel S. Kozma
Represented By: John B. Massopust
Represented By: Daniel J. Millea
Represented By: Henry J. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewane Spilker
Represented By: Andrew W. Cohen
Represented By: Cecilia Fex
Represented By: Stephen D. Mossman
Represented By: Daniel S. Kozma
Represented By: John B. Massopust
Represented By: Daniel J. Millea
Represented By: Henry J. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Paul D. Boeshart
Represented By: Stuart C. Gillespie
Represented By: Bruce K. Trauben
Represented By: Kristine S. Tardiff
Represented By: Scott H. Park
Represented By: Marc A. Smith
Represented By: Elsie B. Kappler
Represented By: Sally R. Johnson
Represented By: G. Evan Pritchard
Represented By: Mark S. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?