Newton v. Standard Candy
Case Number: 8:2006cv00242
Filed: March 2, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER TO WITHDRAW EXHIBITS OR TO SHOW CAUSE WHY EXHIBITS SHOULD NOT BE DESTROYED. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TJS)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 171 the parties' joint Motion to Dismiss. The plaintiff's cause of action against the defendant is dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, and with the parties to be responsible for their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER that upon notice of settlement given by the parties 169 , by 12/31/08, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation). Absent compliance with this order, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER - The plaintiff's Motion in Limine 136 is granted. The plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions 151 is denied. The parties' Stipulation to Waive Jury Trial 160 is adopted, this matter will proceed as a trial to Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JAE, )
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 125 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (SMS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newton v. Standard Candy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?