United States of America v. Mengedoht
Case Number: 8:2006cv00484
Filed: July 13, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 67 Motion to Dismiss; this matter is dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB, )
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that before the court is the Status Report (Filing No. 65) filed in case 8:06CV484. The court notes that the Internal Revenue Service is satisfied that summons has been sufficiently complied with in case 8:06CV484 only, and that action can be c losed. However, the court has not been given any indication that the summons has been satisfied in case 8:06CV485, and the November 7, 2008, 11:30 a.m., hearing will proceed as scheduled. The defendant must appear at the November 7, 2008, hearing or be in contempt of court. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB, )
August 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The motion of the United States of America to amend the order to showcause 4 is granted. The Respondent, Jan Major Mengedoht, shall appear before the undersigned magistrate judge in Courtroom No. 7(Omaha) on the 28th day of September, 2006 , at 9:00 a.m., to show cause why respondent should not be compelled to comply with the Internal Revenue Service summons served on respondent on April 4, 2006. A copy of this Order, together with the petition and Exhibits thereto, be personally serv ed on Jan Major Mengedoht by an official of the Internal Revenue Service within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order and proof of service filed with the Clerk of the District Court within five (5) business days after such service upon responden t. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within ten (10) days of service of copies of this Order, the petition and Exhibits thereto, respondent shall file and serve a written response to the petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if respondent complies with the summons, petitioner and respondent may jointly notify the Court in writing on or before the hearing by filing a notice of compliance with the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Thomas D. Thalken on 8/4/2006. (KBJ)
July 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ORDERED that respondent, Jan Major Mengedoht, appear before the undersignedmagistrate judge in the District Court of the United States for the District of Nebraska, inCourtroom No. 7, Second Floor, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, on the 11th day of September, 2006, at 9:00a.m., to show cause why respondent should not be compelled to comply with the InternalRevenue Service summons served on respondent on April 4, 2006.IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that a copy of this Order, together with the petition andExhibits thereto, be personally served on Jan Major Mengedoht by an official of the InternalRevenue Service within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order and proof of service f iledwith the Clerk of the District Court within five (5) business days after such service uponrespondent.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within ten (10) days of service of copies of thisOrder, the petition and Exhibits thereto, respondent shall file and s erve a written responseto the petition. That if respondent has any defenses to present or motions to make inopposition to the petition, such defenses or motions, if any, shall be made in writing andfiled with the Court, and copies served on the Unite d States Attorney at least five (5)business days prior to the date of the show cause hearing. Only those issues raised bymotion or brought into controversy by the responsive pleading shall be considered by theCourt and any uncontested allegations in the petition shall be deemed admitted; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if respondent complies with the summons,petitioner and respondent may jointly notify the Court in writing on or before the hearing byfiling a notice of compliance with the Clerk of the Court. Upon receipt of such writtennotice, the Court will cancel the hearing. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/11/2006 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken on 7/17/2006. (PCV, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mengedoht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?