Slater et al v. Jelinek et al
Case Number: 8:2006cv00638
Filed: October 6, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting 125 Stipulation for Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice. The stipulation of the parties is approved and adopted. The motion is granted, and this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAE, )
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER - Plaintiffs' objections to the deposition testimony of Kelly Pabon are sustained in part. The portions, listed in this order, of the deposition of Kelly Pabon are stricken. Except as stated in this order, plaintiffs' objections to the deposition testimony of Kelly Pabon are overruled. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAE, )
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER - A settlement conference with the undersigned magistrate judge and the parties convened on January 6, 2009. The parties were unable to arrive at a settlement. Accordingly, this matter shall proceed to trial as previously ordered by the ourt. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JAE, ) Modified on 1/8/2009 to correct signing judge. (JAE, ).
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying 97 Defendants' Motion in Limine. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAE, )
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER that the parties' joint motion for a continuance of the pretrial conference 103 is granted; the pretrial conference in this matter is scheduled for December 30, 2008, at 10:30 a.m.; that in order to conserve time devoted to the conferenc e, counsel are directed to provide to the undersigned magistrate judge at least one working day in advance of the conference, a copy of the final agreed on draft of the proposed final pretrial order; the copy may be delivered to the undersigned' s chambers, e-mailed to the undersigned at thalken@ned.uscourts.gov, faxed to the undersigned's office (402-661-7345), or mailed to the undersigned magistrate judge so as to arrive one working day in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (CJP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slater et al v. Jelinek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?