Securities and Exchange Commission v. Marimuthu et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Jaisankar Marimuthu, Chockalingam Ramanathan and Thirugnanam Ramanathan
Case Number: 8:2007cv00094
Filed: March 12, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 66 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff is given until October 30, 2009 to obtain a Clerk's Entry of Default (Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a)) and to file a separate Motion for Default Judgment (Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b)), or take other appropriate action to prosecute the case. (Case Management Deadline set for 10/30/2009.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 54 Motion to Extend. The plaintiff's motion for final judgment shall be filed by 8/7/09. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SCHEDULING ORDER. The Order to Show Cause 41 is held satisfied. Plaintiff shall electronically file written status reports concerning the service of process on the remaining defendants. The first status report shall be filed by 4/1/2009. Subsequent status reports are due every 120 days thereafter until all remaining defendants are served. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On or before December 15, 2008, plaintiff shall either: (1) effect service on the remaining defendants and file proof of same with the court or (2) show cause why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to effect service within the time limit specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Show Cause Deadline set for 12/15/2008. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT THIRUGNANAM RAMANATHAN granting 38 Motion for Judgment; Judgment is entered in favor of the Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission and against Defendant Thirugnanam Ramanathan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), the said parties to bear their own costs. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB, )
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. This case shall remain stayed and all progression order deadlines suspended through 11/12/2008. Counsel shall advise the court on or before 11/12/2008 as to whether the case should be returned to the active trial docket. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Marimuthu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Laurie M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaisankar Marimuthu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chockalingam Ramanathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thirugnanam Ramanathan
Represented By: Steven M. Virgil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?