Hymond v. Bakewell et al
Petitioner: David Hymond
Respondent: Robert Houston and Dennis Bakewell
Case Number: 8:2007cv00438
Filed: November 15, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 is denied with prejudice. A separate judgment will be issued. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAE, )
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: 1. By December 8, 2008, Petitioner shall file and serve a brief in response tothe Respondents Answer and State Court Records. Petitioner shall submitno other documents unless directed to do so by the court. In the event thatPetitioner does not file a response in accordance with this Memorandum andOrder, the court will rule on the merits of the Petition without further notice; and 2. No later than 30 days after the filing of Petitioners brief, Respondents shall file and serve a reply brief. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(PCV, )
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 , the court preliminarily determines that the following claims are potentially cognizable in federal court: Claims One through Three as described in this Memorand um and Order. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel 3 is denied without prejudice to reassertion. The Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 to the R espondents and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By March 19, 2008, Respondents shall file a motion for summary judgment or an answer. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: March 19, 2008: deadline for Respondents to file answer or motion for summary judgment. If Respondents elect to file a motion for summary judgment, theprocedures listed in this Memorandum and Order shall be followed by Resp ondents and Petitioner. If Respondents file an answer, the procedures listed in this order shall be followed by Respondents and Petitioner. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule 6 ofthe Rules Governing Section 2254 C ases in the United States District Courts. Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 3/19/2008 - deadline for Respondents to file answer or motion for summary judgment.) Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(Copies mailed as directed).(JAE, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hymond v. Bakewell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Hymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dennis Bakewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?