International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22/N.E.C.A. Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Genesis Electrical Services
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22/N.E.C.A. Health and Welfare Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22 Pension Funds A & B, Omaha Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local No. 22 Vaction-Holiday Trust Fund, Omaha Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, National Electrical Benefit Fund, Trustees of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22/N.E.C.A. Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22 Pension Funds A & B, Trustees of the Omaha Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local No. 22 Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund, Trustees of the Omaha Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund and Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund
Defendant: Genesis Electrical Services
Case Number: 8:2008cv00043
Filed: January 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER that the plaintiffs shall take appropriate action against the defendant or show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute on or before the close of business September 25, 2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CORRECTED ORDER - Harding & Shultz, P.C., L.L.O., William A. Harding and Adam J. Prochaska's motion to withdraw as counsel for the defendant 62 is granted. The plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer 73 Is granted. Since Genesis Electrical Services, Inc. failed to have substitute counsel enter an appearance, the Clerk of Court shall strike the answer and counterclaim of defendant Genesis Electrical Services, Inc. and enter default against Genesis Electrical Services, Inc. The entry of default will be set aside, upon written motion, if substitute counsel enters a written appearance on behalf of the defendant prior to entry of default judgment. The plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees Incurred Respondi ng to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order 76 is granted. The plaintiffs are awarded reasonable costs and attorney's fees in the amount of $779.00 for responding to the defendant's Motion for Protective Order 65 . The Clerk of Court shall, at the time of entry of judgment in this case, make this award a part of the judgment entered, unless before that time the parties certify that the award has been satisfied. Harding & Shultz shall immediately serve a copy of this order on the defendant and file a certificate of service therefore. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JAE)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 65 Motion for Protective Order; granting 68 Motion for Hearing. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that the 62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is held in abeyance until April 2, 2009. The defendant shall have until on or before April 2, 2009, to file a response to the motion to withdraw with the Clerk of Court. If no response is received o r if substitute counsel has entered an appearance by that date, the motion to withdraw will be granted. Moving counsel shall immediately serve a copy of this order on the defendant and file a certificate of service therefore. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE granting 57 Motion to Amend ; All depositions, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by May 29, 2009; The Final Pretrial Conference with the undersigned magistrate judge is set for October 27, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. in chambers, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska; Trial is set to commence, at the court's call, during the week of November 30, 2009, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the undersigned magistrate judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 40 Motion to Stay or in the Alternative Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint for Declaratory Relief. A telephone conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on January 9, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. for the purpose of reviewing the preparation of the case to date and the scheduling of the case to trial. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 22 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting 29 Motion for Leave. The sur-reply was considered instanter; granting 32 Motion to Compel. The defendant shall have to on or before October 23, 2008, to supplement its responses to the pla intiffs' Requests for Production ; denying 35 Motion to Stay to Bifurcate Discovery; A telephone conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on October 27, 2008, at 10:30 a.m. for the purpose of reviewing the preparation of the case to date and the scheduling of the case to trial. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22/N.E.C.A. Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Genesis Electrical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22/N.E.C.A. Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Jane L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22 Pension Funds A & B
Represented By: Jane L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omaha Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local No. 22 Vaction-Holiday Trust Fund
Represented By: Jane L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omaha Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Jane L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Electrical Benefit Fund
Represented By: Jane L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22/N.E.C.A. Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Jane L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22 Pension Funds A & B
Represented By: Jane L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Omaha Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local No. 22 Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund
Represented By: Jane L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Omaha Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Jane L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund
Represented By: Jane L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Electrical Services
Represented By: Adam J. Prochaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?