Stewart v. Douglas County Correctional Center et al
Plaintiff: Cordell Curry Stewart
Defendant: Douglas County Correctional Center, Unknown Dutcher and W.L. Stevens
Case Number: 8:2008cv00093
Filed: March 4, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 43 is granted and Stewart's claims are dismissed without prejudice; a separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order; all other pending motions are denied as moot.Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (copy mailed to pro se party)(CJP)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- The Clerk of the Court is directed to cancel the Final Pretrial Conference in this matter that is currently scheduled for April 1, 2010. A separate progression order resetting the dates for the Final Pretrial Conference, and all associated deadlines, may be entered after the court resolves the pending Motions for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG )
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. It is ordered that:(1)The following matter previously scheduled before the undersigned is herewith referred to Judge Zwart, to wit,(A)Nature of hearing:Pretrial conference.(B)Date and time of hearing: Thursday, April 1, 2010, at 11:00 a.m.(C)P lace of hearing: Judge Zwart's chambers, Room 566, United States Courthouse and Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall, North, Lincoln, Nebraska.(2)Judge Zwart will issue a report and recommendation or order as is appropriate. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing (filing no. 28 and Motion for Discovery (filing no. 29 ) are denied. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Motions. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: 1) Defendant's motion to dismiss, (Filing No. 15 ), is granted in part and denied in part as follows: A. Plaintiff's claims against Unknown Dutcher and W.L. Stevens Jr. , in their official capacities, the Douglas County Correctional Center, and Douglas County, Nebraska, are dismissed. B. Plaintiff's claims against Unknown Dutcher and W.L. Stevens Jr., in their individual capacities, as set forth in plaintiffs a mended complaint, are not dismissed. 2) Plaintiff's motion for additional summons, (Filing No. 9 ), is granted. 3) To obtain service of process on Unknown Dutcher and W.L. Stevens Jr., in their individual capacities, the Plaintiff must complete and return the summons forms which the Clerk of the Court will provide. Plaintiff is hereby notified that failure to obtain service of process on either or both of these defendants within 45 days of the date of this order may result in dismissal of this matter without further notice as to the defendant(s) not served. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines:December 29, 2008: Deadline for service of summons on Unknown Dutcher and W.L. Stevens Jr., in their individual capacities. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party along with 2 summons and 2 USM-285 forms)(LKL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Douglas County Correctional Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cordell Curry Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dutcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.L. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?