Norman v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Kimberly Norman
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2008cv00118
Filed: March 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Sarpy
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:451 Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Defendant Union Pacific's Motion for Summary Judgment 46 is granted, and all of Normans above stated claims are dismissed with prejudice. The Pretrial Conference set before Magistrate Judge Gossett on July 7, 2009, is cancelled. A separate Judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge William J. Riley. (JAE)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER - The Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline 50 is granted. The Plaintiff shall respond to the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 46 by filing her brief and index of evidence, if any, on or before May 1, 2009. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAE)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 32 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 24 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Norman
Represented By: W. Craig Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?