Financial Federal Credit v. Wills et al
Plaintiff: Financial Federal Credit
Defendant: Gary L. Wills, James R. Hill, Wills and Wills Development
Case Number: 8:2008cv00184
Filed: April 23, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Accordingly, fees in the amount of $15,280.00 willbe awarded. A judgment in conformity with this Memorandum Opinion will issue this date.Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER that Gary L. Wills was dismissed from this action when it was pending before the Bankruptcy Court, and that Wills is no longer a defendant. The Clerk is directed to notate in the docketing system that this case is closed as to defendant Willis. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; FFCI is awarded $265,525.91 for the deficiency, plus interest in the amount of $64,786.88, which is from November 29, 2007, through March 30, 2009, plus, interest from March 30 , 2009, to the date of judgment in the amount of $132.76 per diem. Counsel for FFCI has fourteen days from the date of this order to brief the issue of attorney fees and costs. Hill has fourteen days thereafter to respond to the request for attorney fees and costs. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB, )
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 JUDGMENT AGAINST WILLS, INC. AND WILLS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC. Pursuant to the Stipulation 58 , judgment is hereby entered for the Plaintiff, Financial Federal Credit, Inc., and against Defendants Wills, Inc., and Wills Development Company, LLC, j ointly and severally, in the amount of $265,525.91, plus interest from November 29, 2007 forward, (currently in the amount of $64,255.84 through March 26, 2009), accruing at $132.76 per diem; the costs of this action; and attorneys fees incurred by Plaintiff for enforcement of the Guarantees in the amount of $7,879.50. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JAE)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.5(a)(1) and 28 U.S.C. § 157, this case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska.This case shall be terminated for statistical purposes by the Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska. The Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska shall deliver the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Financial Federal Credit v. Wills et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Federal Credit
Represented By: Douglas R. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary L. Wills
Represented By: Patricia Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Hill
Represented By: Anthony Malley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wills
Represented By: Patricia Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wills Development
Represented By: Patricia Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?