Carney v. Husqvarna Professional Outdoor Products
Plaintiff: Kerry A. Carney
Defendant: Husqvarna Professional Outdoor Products
Case Number: 8:2008cv00266
Filed: June 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Gage
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - that the stipulation 28 is approved and adopted; this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay its own fees and costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that on or before April 20, 2009, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom, at strom@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which wil l fully dispose of the case; if the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice; absent compliance with this order, this case (including all count erclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice in accordance with NECivR 68.1; the pretrial conference and trial previously scheduled are cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (CJP)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - Upon the oral request of counsel for the defendant and with counsel's representation that no other party objects to the request, the pretrial conference previously scheduled for April 3, 2009, at 1:30 p.m. is hereby rescheduled to March 27, 2009, at 3:00 p.m.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2008 at 08:15 AM before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that defendant's motion 13 is granted; the parties shall have until September 24, 2008, to file their report of planning conference. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carney v. Husqvarna Professional Outdoor Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry A. Carney
Represented By: Joy A. Shiffermiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Husqvarna Professional Outdoor Products
Represented By: J. Randall Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?