Lester v. Garrett Aviation Services
Plaintiff: Shane Lester
Defendant: Garrett Aviation Services
Case Number: 8:2008cv00316
Filed: July 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendant's motion for summary judgment, Filing No. 78 , is granted. The plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, Filing No. 74 , is denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 60 Motion for Leave. On or before September 9, 2009, each party shall provide all other parties with deposition and discovery designations. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - The parties' joint motion to extend pretrial deadlines (Filing No. 56 ) is granted as set forth below. Depositions due 9/4/09. Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2009 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial set for 10/19/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Omaha before Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL)
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lester v. Garrett Aviation Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Lester
Represented By: Kathryn J. Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Aviation Services
Represented By: Terry A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?