Marshall v. Houston, et al
Petitioner: Lee Otis Marshall
Respondent: Robert Houston and Karan Shortridge
Case Number: 8:2008cv00362
Filed: August 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner Lee Otis Marshall's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ) is denied in all respects and this action is dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (GJG)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that no later than March 16, 2009, Respondents shall file Petitioner's December 13, 2007 post conviction motion filed in the Lancaster County, Nebraska District Court as a supplemental state court record. ( Case Management Deadline set for 3/16/2009.) Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that all three of Petitioner's claims, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizabl e in federal court. Petitioners Motion for Appointment of Counsel (filing no. 1 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. The Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( filing no. 1) to Respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By December 5, 2008, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or an answer. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management dead line in this case using the following text: December 5, 2008: deadline for Respondent to file answer or motion for summary judgment.***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 12/5/2008.) Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed )(GJG, )
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (filing no. 2 ) is provisionally granted and Petitioner will not be required to pay the $5.00 fee at this time.Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Houston, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lee Otis Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Karan Shortridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?