Thomas v. Great Western Bank
Plaintiff: Rudy M. Thomas
Defendant: Great Western Bank
Case Number: 8:2008cv00370
Filed: August 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 29:203 Equal Pay Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Motion to Extend Deadlines. The Amended Final Progression Order 30 is further amended to provide that the discovery, deposition and summary judgment deadlines are extended to 12/15/2009. The parties are given until 11/15/2009 to submit their final witness and exhibit lists. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Extend Deadlines. The parties waive jury trial. Non-Jury Trial set for 2/16/2010 before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2010 before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Amend. Amended Complaint due by 2/13/2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - The Report and Recommendation 16 is adopted in its entirety. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand 9 is denied. The matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for the entry of a progression order. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KBJ)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that MOTION to Remand 9 be denied. Pursuant to NECivR 72.3, a party may object to this Report and Recommendation by filing an "Objection to Report and Recommendation" within 10 days after being served with the recommendation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Great Western Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy M. Thomas
Represented By: Thomas J. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Western Bank
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?