Lewis v. State of Nebraska
Petitioner: Eric F. Lewis
Respondent: State of Nebraska
Case Number: 8:2008cv00396
Filed: August 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Recusal (filing no. 29 ) is denied. Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration (filing nos. 27 and 28 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Notice of Appeal (filing no. 22 ) is untimely. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (filing no. 23 ) is denied as moot. The Clerk of the court shall not process the appeal to the Court of Appeals. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Respondent's motion to file a corrected brief (filing 17 ) is granted. Respondent's motion for summary judgment (filing 15 ) is granted but only as provided herein. This case is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be issued. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-Upon initial review of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that all four of Petitioner's claims, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: March 16, 2009: deadline for Respondent to file answer or motion for summary judgment. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed)(LKH)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The application to proceed in forma pauperis (filing no. 2 ) is provisionally granted and Petitioner will not be required to pay the $5.00 fee at this time. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric F. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?