Patterson v. Houston
Petitioner: Henry E. Patterson, Jr.
Respondent: Robert Houston
Case Number: 8:2008cv00456
Filed: October 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (filing no. 28 ) is granted. Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel (filing no. 30 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion before the Eighth Circuit. P etitioner's Motion for Certificate of Appealability (filing no. 36 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion before the Eighth Circuit. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Court of Appeals a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Petitioner shall have until September 5, 2009, to file a Motion for Certificate of Appealability and Brief in support. In the event that Petitioner fails to file a Motion and Brief, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, the court will deny the issuance of a Certificate of Appealability without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management in this case with the following text: September 5, 2009: check for filing of Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is before the court on Petitioner Henry E. Patterson Jr.'s (Patterson) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Petition). (Filing No. 1 .) Respondents filed an Answer and Brief on the merits of the Petition (fili ng nos. 9 and 16 ), State Court Records (filing nos. 10 and 24 ), and a Reply Brief (filing no. 22 ). Patterson filed a Brief on the merits of the Petition. (Filing No. 21 .) This matter is therefore deemed fully submitted. IT IS THEREFORE OR DERED that: Petitioner Henry E. Patterson Jr.'s Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKH)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is before the court on its own motion. On November 25, 2008, Respondents filed relevant State Court Records. (Filing No. 10 .) The court notes that Attachment 13, the Nebraska Court of Appeals Memorandum Opinion, is incomplete. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: no later than June 5, 2009, Respondents shall file with the court the entire Nebraska Court of Appeals Memorandum Opinion. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKH)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Copies of Exhibits (filing no. 14 ) is granted. Respondents shall immediately provide a copy of attachments 6 7 8 and 9 to Petitioner. Petitioner's Motion to Reconsider (filing no. [15 ]) and Motion for Clarification (filing no. 18 ) are denied. In the event that Petitioner seeks a copy of the court's Local Rules, he should contact the Clerk of the court to determine the cost of procedure for obtaining a copy of the Local Rules. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 filed by Henry E. Patterson, Jr. Upon initial review of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that all seven of Petitioner 9;s claims, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (filing no. 1 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. By November 28, 2008, Respondent shal l file a motion for summaryjudgment or an answer. ***(Pro Se Case Management Deadline: deadline for Respondent to file answer or motion for summary judgment set for 11/28/2008.) Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed to pro se party and as directed)(JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Henry E. Patterson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?