Wallace v. Douglas County, Nebraska et al
Plaintiff: Chantella Wallace
Defendant: Douglas County, Nebraska and Jeffery L. Newton
Case Number: 8:2008cv00478
Filed: October 23, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM and ORDER - the parties' Joint Stipulation for Dismissal (Filing No. 69 ) is approved; All claims asserted by Plaintiff Chantella Wallace against Defendants Douglas County, Nebraska, and Jeffrey L. Newton, are dismissed withprejudice; and Each party will pay its own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that on or before 5/27/2010 the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stiuplation) and shall submit to District Judge Smith Camp a draft order which will fully dispose of the case; absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice; and any pending motions are denied as moot as ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (SED)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 4/26/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (ARL, )
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 41 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying 51 defendants' Motion/objection. Defendants ordered to produce the responsive materials no later than Wednesday, April 7, 2010. The final pretrial conference remains set for April 12, 2010 at 11:00 AM. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Douglas County, Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantella Wallace
Represented By: John E. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County, Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery L. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?