Crago v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Donald L. Crago
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2008cv00482
Filed: October 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Federal Employer's Liability Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM OPINION that the Court finds Crago's motion to continue trial setting, amend order setting schedule for progression of a civil case, and extend motion for summary judgment 99 should be denied. Union Pacific's motion for summary judgment 92 should be granted and Union Pacific's motion in limine re: Robert O. Andres, Ph.D. 89 should be denied as moot. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 105 Motion to Withdraw Document; filings 102 Motion to Exclude, 103 and 104 are deemed withdrawn. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying 65 motion to change place of trial. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2009 at 01:30 PM before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 72 Motion for Leave to withdraw. Mainess Gibson and Amy Nilsen are deemed withdrawn as counsel for defendant. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 60 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. George E. Chandler is deemed withdrawn as counsel for plaintiff. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER setting case-specific deadlines, including date parties should be prepared to try case as 8/4/08. Ordered by Judge Judith K. Guthrie. (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crago v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald L. Crago
Represented By: John G. Zgourides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Amy L. Nilsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?