Vacanti v. Sunset Financial Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Milo Vacanti
Defendant: Sunset Financial Services, Inc., Kansas City Life Insurance Co. and Bryan S. Behrens
Case Number: 8:2009cv00044
Filed: January 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Stay Pending Appeal, Fil. #50, is denied. Ordered by Judge Timothy J. Mahoney. (TCL )
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER - Defendant Sunset Financial Services, Inc's motion for leave to amend to file crossclaims (Case No. 8:08CV335, filing 170; Case No. 8:08CV00399, filing 169; Case No. 8:08CV00436, filing 160; Case No. 8:09CV00013, filing 122; Case No. 8:09CV00044, filing 87 ) is granted. Sunset shall file its cross-claims by or before July 15, 2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KBJ)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER - Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a sur-reply brief is granted. (Case No. 8:08CV00335, filing 193; Case No. 8:08CV00399, filing 192; Case No. 8:08CV00436, filing 183; Case No. 8:09CV00013, filing 145; Case No. 8:09CV00044, filing 110 ). The court hereby takes notice of Plaintiffs' proposed brief, which was submitted with the present motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KBJ)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER - The Motion for leave to depose Bryan S. Behrens 83 is granted. Plaintiffs and Defendant Sunset Financial Services Inc. are granted leave of this court to depose Bryan S. Behrens as set forth in this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KBJ)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY, entered by agreement of the parties. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) planning report due 1/10/2011; proposed protective order(s) due 1/10/2011; Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures due 1/24/2011. The conference now set for 1/18/2011 at 9:30 AM will be held as previously scheduled. The Receiver may, but is not required to, participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER LIFTING STAY - The "Motion by Certain Investors to Lift the Stay" is granted, as follows: The stay entered on March 4, 2009, is hereby dissolved to the extent the stay applies to lawsuits filed by the moving investors. The Clerk of th e Court is directed to file this order electronically in the following cases: 8:08cv324 Carlson v. Sunset Financial Services 8:08cv335 Lustgraaf v. Sunset Financial Services 8:08cv347 Katz v. Sunset Financial Services 8:08cv399 Poole v. Sunset Financ ial Services 8:08cv422 Lohrman v. Sunset Financial Services 8:08cv436 Vacanti v. Sunset Financial Services 8:09cv013 Green v. Sunset Financial Services 8:09cv044 Vacanti v. Sunset Financial Services 8:08cv523 Behrens v. Arch Insurance Company. NOTE: Pursuant to chambers, the order is corrected to change the reference from 8:08cv44 to 8:09cv44. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAB)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 36 Motion to lift stay and for leave to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff shall file and serve the Amended Complaint no later than 11/1/2010. Defendants shall respond within the time allowed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 Joint Motion to Stay. This case is stayed until the interlocutory appeal in Vacanti v. Sunset Fin. Servs., et al., Case No. 8:08CV436 (D. Neb.), 8th Cir. No. 09-2965, is resolved. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 96 Motion to Stay Proceedings (in 8:08cv13). All litigation and/or proceedings naming Bryan S. Behrens and/or National Investments, Inc., as parties shall be stayed, as against those parties, untilfurther order of this Court, with the following exceptions; The above-captioned case, SEC v. Behrens, et al., United States District Court for the District of Nebraska, Case No. 8:08cv13; Behrens v. Arch Insurance Company, United States District Court for the District of Nebraska, Case No. 8:08cv523; and Behrens v. Blunk, filed in the District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, at Doc. 1090 No. 178. The Clerk of the Court is directed file this Order electronically in the following cases currently pending before this Court: Carlson v. Sunset Financial Services, Inc., 8:08cv324; Lustgraaf v. Sunset Financial Services, Inc., 8:08cv335; Katz v. Sunset Financial Services, Inc., 8:08cv347; Poole v. Sunset Financial Services, Inc., 8:08cv399; Lohrman v. Sunset Financi al Services, Inc., 8:08cv422; Vacanti v. Sunset Financial Services, Inc., 8:08cv436; Green v. Sunset Financial Services, Inc., 8:09cv13; Vacanti v. Sunset Financial Services, Inc., 8:09cv44; and Behrens v. Arch Insurance Company, 8:08cv523. Additiona lly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to e-mail this Order to the following: Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr. at pbrookhouser@mcgathnorth.com, Richard Jeffries at rickjeffries@clinewilliams.com, John W. Shaw at jshaw@bowse-law.com, Nick J . Kurt at nkurt@bowse-law.com, Steven E. Achelpohl at achelpohl@usa.net, Thomas K. Harmon at harmonlaw@bigplanet.com, Tory M. Bishop at tory.bishop@kutakrock.com, Angela Probasco at angela.probasco@kutakrock.com. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies e-mailed as directed) (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vacanti v. Sunset Financial Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milo Vacanti
Represented By: Catherine C. Lemoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunset Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan S. Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?