Ingram v Covenant Care Midwest, Inc., et al
Case Number: 8:2009cv00110
Filed: March 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Medical Malpractice

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL granting 105 Stipulation for Dismissal. An Order of Dismissal is entered with prejudice, each party to pay their own attorney fees and costs, complete record waived. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER that on or before October 22, 2010, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal; Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice; The trial previously scheduled is cancelled and the motions in limine 78 , 79 , 97 and Stipulation 92 are terminated upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 100 Motion to Dismiss Party ; Defendant Covenant Care, Inc. is dismissed as a party to this action. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB, )
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 39 Motion to Compel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE and adopting 32 Stipulation. Trial remains scheduled for August 16, 2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 16 Stipulation; The telephone planning conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will take place as scheduled on August 21, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. Central Daylight Time at which time all future deadlines will be discussed. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the telephone conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingram v Covenant Care Midwest, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?