Warbelton et al v. Houston, et al.
Plaintiff: Eric Warbelton and Jose Silva
Defendant: Robert Houston, Fred Britton, Brian Gage, Witherspoon, Busboom, Connelly, Settles, McDonnell, Tinkler, Mars, Herling, Hillman, Campbell, Lowe, Weddle, Brad Root, Gilkerson, Gerdes, Theresa Kalin and Simon
Case Number: 8:2009cv00132
Filed: April 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying as moot 47 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAE)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (filing no. 40 ) is granted. Plaintiffs' federal claims against Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)(GJG)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' Motion to File Out of Time (filing no. 39 ) is granted. The Motion for Summary Judgment (filing no. 40 ) is deemed timely filed. On the court's own motion, Plaintiffs shall have until July 1, 2010, in w hich to file a response to the Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Motion to Extend Summary Judgment Deadline (filing no. 38 ) is denied as moot. The Final Pretrial Conference, scheduled for July 20, 2010, at 10:00 a.m., is canceled. If n ecessary, the court will set a new date for the Final Pretrial Conference after resolving the pending Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum and Order to Magistrate Judge Zwart. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se parties and provided to Judge Zwart)(GJG)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. It is ordered that: (1)The following matter previously scheduled before the undersigned is herewith referred to Judge Zwart, to wit,(A)Nature of hearing:Pretrial conference.(B)Date and time of hearing: Tuesday, July 20, 2010, at 10:00 a.m.(C)P lace of hearing: Judge Zwarts chambers, Room 566, United States Courthouse and Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall, North, Lincoln, Nebraska.(2)Judge Zwart will issue a report and recommendation or order as is appropriate. (Copy of order mailed to pro se party.)Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 14 Motion to Amend; The Clerk of the court is directed to file the Amended Complaint, attached to Filing No. 14, as a separate document in this matter; denying as moot 15 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; granting 16 Motion to Extend ; Plaintiffs shall have until December 28, 2009 to complete service of process on all Defendants; The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management in this matter with the following text: December 28, 2009: Check for completion of serviceof process on Defendants. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB, )
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs' monetary damages claims against defendants are dismissed. Plaintiffs' claims for injunctive relief against Defendants Gage, Bushboom, McDonnell, Connelly, Hillman, Root and Simon are dismissed. Plaintiff s must complete and return the summons forms which the Clerk will provide. The Clerk shall send 13 summons forms and 13 USM-285 forms to plaintiffs together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiffs shall obtain service within 120 days of the date of this order. The Clerk is directed to set a Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 9/18/2009: check for completion of service of summons. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed to pro se party and as directed) (JSF)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STRICKEN - MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $8.71 by 6/18/09. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to plaintiff's institutio n. The Clerk is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: 6/18/09: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed as directed and to pro se party) (JSF) Stricken on 5/18/2009 per 10 (JSF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warbelton et al v. Houston, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Warbelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Busboom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Settles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tinkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Root
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerdes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Kalin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?