United States of America v. 2006 Fleetwood Enterprises Providence 39' Recreational Vehicle, VIN 4VBN1M946C051841
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 2006 Fleetwood Enterprises Providence 39' Recreational Vehicle, VIN 4VBN1M946C051841
Case Number: 8:2009cv00174
Filed: May 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Extend Time to File a Status Report. Written Status Report shall be filed by 10/15/2010. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAE)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - Before the Court on the joint status report and consent motion to continue stay 17 - It Is Ordered that the action is continued. The parties shall file a written status report on or before 9/15/2010. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAE)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that the stay is continued. The parties shall file a status report on or before May 17, 2010. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 2006 Fleetwood Enterprises Providence 39' Recreational Vehicle, VIN 4VBN1M946C051841
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2006 Fleetwood Enterprises Providence 39' Recreational Vehicle, VIN 4VBN1M946C051841
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?