Aldaco v. Houston
Petitioner: Samson Aldaco
Respondent: Robert Houston
Case Number: 8:2009cv00177
Filed: May 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 47 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Samson Aldaco shall pay the appellate filing fee of $455 by 8/9/2010. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/9/2010: deadline for Petitioner to pay $455.00 appellate filing fee. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAE)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Petitioner is directed to either tender the $455.00 filing fee or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis and an affidavit of poverty in support thereof by July 2, 2010. If Petitioner fails to comply with this Mem orandum and Order the court will not process his appeal. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit; and the Clerk of court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: "July 2, 2010: Check for payment or IFP motion." Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms) (JSF)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 37 Petitioner's Amended Motion to Extend. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (PCV, )
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 is denied in all respects and this action is dismissed with prejudice; a separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this memorandum and order as ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (SED)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 15 The Petitioner's Motion to Reassign Case for the reasons set forth in Judge Smith Camp's August 17, 2009 Memorandum and Order 24 . Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 16 Petitioner's Second Motion for Recusal; granting 19 Respondent's Objection to Motion for Recusal. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(PCV, )
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Petitioner's Motion for Recusal 9 and Motion to Reassign Case 10 are denied. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (copy mailed to pro se party)(CJP)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that upon initial review of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 , the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's two claims are potentially cognizable in federal court; the Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 to Respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail; by July 30, 2009, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgmen t or state court records in support of an answer; the Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 30, 2009: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answ er or motion for summary judgment; the Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: August 31, 2009: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(CJP)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel 5 is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (copy mailed to pro se party)(CJP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aldaco v. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samson Aldaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?