Cogill v. Houston et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Cogill
Defendant: Robert Houston, Fred Britten, Giser, Carrie Cropp, Adkins, Jannet Newman, Donavan, Kirkendall and Tecumseh State Correctional Institute
Case Number: 8:2009cv00209
Filed: June 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Cogill's claims against Newman are dismissed without prejudice because Cogill failed to prosecute this matter diligently and failed to comply with the court's orders. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's Objection to Memorandum and Order (filing no. 89 ), which the court liberally construes as a Motion for Reconsideration, is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal (filing no. 86 ), construed as a Motion for Interlocutory Appeal, is denied. The Clerk of the court is directed not to process the Notice of Appeal. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proce ed in Forma Pauperis on appeal (filing no. 87 ) is denied as moot. In accordance with the court's previous Memorandum and Order, Plaintiff has until March 18, 2011, to complete service of process on the remaining defendant. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Plaintiff (filing no. 68 ) is granted. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend (filing no. 53 ), construed as a Motion to Reconsider, is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendants' Motions to Stay Discovery 38 and 40 are granted; Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Request Interrogatories 32 and Motion for Leave to Request Production of Documents 33 are denied without prejudice to reassertion; Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Houston and Britten 35 is granted. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (copy mailed to pro se party)(CJP)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that to obtain service of process on Defendants, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons forms which the Clerk of the court will provide; the Clerk of the court shall send 8 summons forms and 8 USM-285 forms to Plaintiff t ogether with a copy of this Memorandum and Order; Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk of the court; the Marshal shall serve the summons and Amended Complaint without payment of costs or fees; Plaintiff is hereby notified that failure to obtain service of process on a defendant within 120 days of the date of this order may result in dismissal of this matter without further notice as to such defendant; the Clerk of Court is direct ed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: February 16, 2010: Check for completion of service of summons; Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of her current address at all times while this case is pending. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms)(CJP)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's claims against Defendant TSCI and Plaintiff's monetary damages claims against Defendants Houston, Britten, Giser, Adkins, Donovan, and Kirkendall in their official capacities are dismissed. Plaintiff shal l have until October 1, 2009, to amend his Complaint. No summons will be issued until after Plaintiff has had an opportunity to amend his Complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se cas e management deadline in this case using the following text: Review amended complaint on October 1, 2009. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAE)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP 2 is granted; Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $.19 by August 21, 2009, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion; if the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case is subject to dismissal; after payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the manner se t forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court; the Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution; the C lerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: August 21, 2009: initial partial filing fee payment due; Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times,and all parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and by the court's Local Rules while this case is pending; Plaintiff shall review the Notice Regarding Summons Forms attached to this Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (copies mailed as directed)(CJP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cogill v. Houston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Cogill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Britten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Cropp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jannet Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirkendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tecumseh State Correctional Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?