September 25, 2012 |
Filing
119
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 114 Motion for Judgment by consent. The Plaintiff's unopposed 115 Motion to Dismiss Party is granted. The Plaintiff's claims against defendant Envision Financial Group, Inc. and En vision Investment Advisors (LLC) are dismissed. Defendant Jindras Consent (Filing No. 114 , Attachment 1) is incorporated herein as if fully set forth. Defendant Jindra is liable for disgorgement of $484,235.52, representing profits gain ed as a result of the conduct alleged in the Complaint, which is deemed satisfied by the order of restitution in United States v. Jindra, No. 8:10CR43, Filing No. 101. By agreement of the parties, no civil penalty is imposed in this case. This co urts order for preliminary injunction, asset freeze, and other equitable relief (Filing No. 16 ) is hereby dissolved. Any frozen funds held in bank accounts as a result of the Temporary Restraining Order and Order of Preliminary Injunction (Fili ng No. 16 ) shall be applied to defendant Jindras criminal restitution order in United States v. Jindra, No. 8:10CR43. A Final Judgment and Injunction in accordance with Memorandum and Order and defendant Jindras Consent (Filing No. 114, Attachment 1) will issue this date. This court retains jurisdiction over this matter for the purpose of enforcing the terms of the Final Judgment and Injunction. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
|
May 8, 2012 |
Filing
103
ORDER granting Motion of Steven Lefler for authorization to pay Mr. Achelpohl for services rendered pursuant to this court's order of July 8, 2009 17 . Mr. Lefler is authorized to disburse $659.86 to Mr. Achelpohl for services rendered. Mr. Lefler shall file a written request to be relieved of his duties as "stand-by counsel" in these proceedings upon an appropriate showing. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
|
March 6, 2012 |
Filing
96
ORDER -Based on the accounting filed 95 and Steven Lefler's Motion 94 for Authorization to pay Mr. Achelpohl for services rendered, Mr. Lefler is authorized to disburse $198.00 to Mr. Achelpohl for services rendered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
|
January 11, 2012 |
Filing
91
ORDER granting 89 Motion for Attorney Fees - Pursuant to Order 17 , and based on the accounting filed 90 , Mr. Lefler is authorized to disburse $155.34 to Mr. Achelpohl for services rendered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TEL)
|
December 14, 2011 |
Filing
85
ORDER granting 83 Motion for Authorization to pay for services rendered. Mr. Lefler is authorized to disburse $264.00 for services rendered to Steve Achelpohl. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
|
November 4, 2011 |
Filing
80
ORDER granting 79 Motion for Attorney Fees. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
|
May 9, 2011 |
Filing
73
ORDER on the 71 Motion for Attorney Fees. Based upon the accounting filed 72 , Mr. Lefler is authorized to disburse $88.00 to Mr. Achelpohl for services rendered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
|
February 4, 2011 |
Filing
68
ORDER granting 66 Motion for authorization to pay Mr. Achelpohl for services rendered pursuant to this court's order of July 8, 2009 17 . Based upon the accounting filed 67 , Mr. Lefler is authorized to disburse $308.84 to Mr. Achelpohl for services rendered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
|
December 21, 2010 |
Filing
63
ORDER on the Motion for Attorney Fees 61 , filed by Steven Lefler for authorization to pay Mr. Achelpohl for services rendered pursuant to this court's order of July 8, 2009 17 . Based upon the accounting filed (Filing No. 62 ), Mr. Lefler is authorized to disburse $528.00 to Mr. Achelpohl for services rendered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
|
March 1, 2010 |
Filing
50
ORDER - Steven Lefler's motion for release of funds (Filing No. 47 ) is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
|
August 25, 2009 |
Filing
29
ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS UNTIL SEPTEMBER 23, 2009 AND ALLOWING THIRD PARTY DISCOVERY - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, aside from the exception noted below, the proceedings in this case shall be stayed until September 23, 2009. During the pendency of the stay, Defendants and Relief Defendant shall not be required to answer, respond to discovery, or produce information required by the Order of Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. 16) at paragraphs 9A-E. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that as of the date of this Order, Plaintiff may seek discovery from third parties as provided for under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference will be held on September 23, 2009, at 8:30 a.m. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
|
July 8, 2009 |
Filing
17
ORDER regarding cashier's checks in payment of attorney fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (SMS, )
|
July 7, 2009 |
Filing
16
ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, ASSET FREEZE AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF - The SEC's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Filing No. 5 ) is granted asto Defendants Jindra and Envision Investment Advisors, LLC and ReliefDefendant Envision Financial Group, Inc as set forth in this Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL ) Modified on 7/7/2009 to add Copies mailed to pro se party(TCL ).
|
June 30, 2009 |
Filing
12
ORDER regarding 5 Motion for TRO (copy of this order mailed to Defendants). Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (SMS, )
|