Aden
Plaintiff: Sharon Aden
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 8:2009cv00220
Filed: July 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 84 Stipulation. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs, and complete record waived. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB, )
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STRICKEN - ORDER regarding notice of settlement given to the magistrate judge on March 9, 2011, by counsel for plaintiff. IT IS ORDERED that: On or before March 24, 2011, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or ot her dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TEL) Modified on 3/9/2011 to add the word stricken pursuant to Order 81 . (TEL)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE granting 59 Motion to Extend ; the plaintiff shall have to on or before October 18, 2010, to file a response to the defendants MOTION for Summary Judgment 53 ; All depositions, wh ether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by November 29, 2010; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2011 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial is set to commence, at the court's call, during the week of 2/14/2011 before Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and a jury. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that the Plaintiff's time for filing her response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be extended to 9/28/2010. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE the joint motion to extend progression order deadlines 51 is granted; Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2010 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken; Jury Trial set for 1/18/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon as ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (SED)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 33 Motion to Strike Request for Jury Trial and Certain Damages. The plaintiff's request for jury trial with respect to her ADEA claim is stricken. The request made pursuant to Title VII will, however, be preserved. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Dismiss Party. Greg Christian and Michelle Williamson are dismissed from this matter as parties. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Aden
Represented By: Elaine A. Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?