Ambrose et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ambrose, Bryan Ambrose and Edward Ambrose
Defendant: Menard, Inc, a Wisconsin Corporation
Case Number: 8:2009cv00240
Filed: July 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Sarpy
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that the 42 Stipulation for Dismissal is approved and adopted. This action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) by 10/30/2010. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The final pretrial conference before the undersigned set for October 15, 2010, is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (JSF)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 37 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER- Final Pretrial Conference is set for October 15, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate F.A. Gossett, in chambers; Trial is set to commence at 9:00 a.m. on November 1, 2010 in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Lyle E. Strom and a jury. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 12/22/2009 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ambrose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ambrose
Represented By: Joseph L. Fitzgibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Ambrose
Represented By: Joseph L. Fitzgibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Ambrose
Represented By: Joseph L. Fitzgibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc, a Wisconsin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?