INGWERSEN v. PLANET GROUP INC et al
Plaintiff: DAVID D INGWERSEN
Defendant: PLANET GROUP INC and West Partners LLC
Case Number: 8:2009cv00249
Filed: July 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER - The parties' Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice (Filing No. 194 ) is approved. This action, Case No. 8:09CV249, is dismissed with prejudice. The parties will pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER - On or before June 27, 2011, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, at smithcamp@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order tha t will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, then the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Any pending motions and stipulations are denied as moot. All pending deadlines, including the trial date, are suspended. Absent compliance with this order, this case may be dismissed without further notice in accordance with NECivR 68.1. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Partial Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 75 ) filed by Planet Group Inc., and West Partners, LLC, is granted in part as follows: a. The Fourth Cause of Action in David Ingwersen's Complaint (Filin g No. 1 ), is dismissed, with prejudice, b. The Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is otherwise denied; The Motion in Limine (Filing No. 109 ) filed by Planet Group, Inc. and West Partners, LLC, is granted as follows: a. Any representative of Davi d Ingwersen and his counsel shall not make any reference or statement displaying any exhibits or otherwise presenting any of the following matters to the jury, whether in voir dire questioning, opening statements, questions and answers during examina tion, offering exhibits or in final arguments at trial that reference: David Ingwersen's fourth claim for relief (Tortious Interference with Payment Due on Promissory Note) because such note has been paid in full, and that claim is withdrawn; b. The Motion is otherwise denied without prejudice to reassertion at the time of trial; The Motion in Limine (Filing No. 118 ) filed by David Ingwersen, is granted as follows: a. Any representative of Planet Group, Inc., and West Partners LLC, and th eir counsel, shall not make any reference or statement displaying any exhibits or otherwise presenting any of the following matters to the jury, whether in voir dire questioning, opening statements, questions and answers during examination, offering exhibits or in final arguments at trial that Planet Group has any first-party claim against Ingwersen for alleged inaccurate representations or warranties in the Share Purchase Agreement concerning Opticard customers, accounts receivable, or attorney fees incurred prior to closing of the Share Purchase Agreement entered into by the parties on November 28, 2007; b. The Motion is otherwise denied without prejudice to reassertion at the time of trial; The List of Reserved Objections of David Ingwer sen to Designated Exhibits of Planet Group, Inc., and West Partners, LLC. (Filing No. 120 ) is overruled without prejudice to reassertion at the time of trial; and The Motion in Limine (Filing No. 165 ) filed by Planet Group, Inc., is denied as moot. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00249-LSC-FG3, 8:09-cv-00263-LSC-FG3, 8:10-cv-00453-LSC-FG3 Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TEL)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motions for Summary Judgment (Case No. 8:09CV249, Filing Nos. 61 , 158 ; Case No. 8:09CV263 Filing Nos. 62,159; and Case No. 8:10CV453,Filing No. 44 ) filed by David Ingwersen are granted. Plaintiff Planet Group Inc. 9;s Complaint in Case No. 8:09CV263 is dismissed, with prejudice. Plaintiff Planet Group Inc.'s Complaint in Case No. 8:10CV453 is dismissed,with prejudice. All other pending motions in Case No. 8:09CV263 and Case No. 8:10CV453 are denied as moot. A separate judgment will be entered. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00249-LSC -FG3, 8:09-cv-00263-LSC -FG3, 8:10-cv-00453-LSC -FG3 Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL ) Modified on 4/21/2011 to correct links(TCL ).
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL JURY TRIAL). Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00249-LSC -FG3, 8:09-cv-00263-LSC -FG3, 8:10-cv-00453-LSC -FG3. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER regarding (146) and (148) Motions to Compel in case 8:09-cv-00249-LSC -FG3; (147) and (149) Motions to Compel in case 8:09-cv-00263-LSC -FG3; (32) and (34) Motions to Compel in case 8:10-cv-00453-LSC -FG3. Counsel are ordered to confer, as req uired by Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a) and NECivR 7.0.1(i), in an actual good-faith effort to resolve these discovery disputes. If counsel are successful in resolving their differences, and the motions can be withdrawn or denied as moot, counsel shall file written notices to that effect no later than Friday, 2/4/2010. If counsel find they are unable to resolve their current discovery disputes, they shall file sworn affidavits with the court explaining why it is impossible for them to resolve the disput es without seeking court action. Said affidavits shall be filed no later than the close of business on 2/4/2010, together with fully-briefed responses to the motions to compel, specifically identifying and addressing each discovery request and objection at issue. No reply briefs will be allowed. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00249-LSC -FG3, 8:09-cv-00263-LSC -FG3, 8:10-cv-00453-LSC -FG3 Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER denying (140) Objection in case 8:09-cv-00249-LSC-FG3; denying (141) Objection in case 8:09-cv-00263-LSC-FG3; denying (25) Objection in case 8:10-cv-00453-LSC-FG3. Planet Group's "Objection to Notice of Intention to Serve Rule 45 Records Subpoena" is denied. Ingwersen's Rule 45 subpoena may issue forthwith. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00249-LSC -FG3, 8:09-cv-00263-LSC -FG3, 8:10-cv-00453-LSC -FG3Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER - Case No. 8:10cv453 is hereby consolidated for discovery, trial, and all other purposes with Consolidated Cases Nos. 8:09cv249 and 8:09cv263. The cases will be tried to a jury in Omaha, Nebraska. Case No. 8:09cv249 remains designated as the &q uot;Lead Case." Cases Nos. 8:09cv263 and 8:10cv453 are designated as the "Member Cases." The court's CM/ECF System now has the capacity for "spreading" text among the consolidated cases. If properly docketed, the documen ts filed in the Lead Case will automatically be filed in all Member Cases. To this end, the parties are instructed to file all further documents (except those described in paragraph 4) in the Lead Case, No. 8:09cv249, and to select the option "y es" in response to the System's question whether to spread the text. The parties may not use the spread text feature to file complaints, amended complaints, and answers; to pay filing fees electronically using pay.gov; or to file items rel ated to service of process. If a party believes that an item in addition to those described in paragraph 4 should not be filed in all the consolidated cases, the party must move for permission to file the item in one or more member cases. The motion for permission must be filed in all the consolidated cases using the spread text feature. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00249-LSC -FG3, 8:09-cv-00263-LSC -FG3, 8:10-cv-00453-LSC -FG3Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 SCHEDULING ORDER. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00249-LSC-FG3, 8:09-cv-00263-LSC-FG3. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 115 Objection to Mediation Reference Order. The mediation reference order 107 is amended as requested. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying (71) Motion to Extend Deposition Deadline in case 8:09-cv-00249-LSC-FG3; denying (72) Motion to Extend Deposition Deadline in case 8:09-cv-00263-LSC-FG3; however, Ingwersen may conduct the depositions of Joe Hartnett, John Morey, Merri Wees and Mike Wofford as agreed to by opposing counsel. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00249-LSC-FG3, 8:09-cv-00263-LSC-FG3 Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying (22) Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions in case 8:09-cv-00249-LSC -FG3; denying (22) Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions in case 8:09-cv-00263-LSC -FG3 Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00249-LSC -FG3, 8:09-cv-00263-LSC -FG3Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting (56) Motion to Extend in case 8:09-cv-00249-LSC -FG3. Expert disclosure deadlines and deposition deadline extended as requested. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00249-LSC -FG3, 8:09-cv-00263-LSC -FG3 Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting (52) Stipulation in case 8:09-cv-00249-LSC-FG3; granting (53) Stipulation in case 8:09-cv-00263-LSC -FG3. Deadlines are extended as requested in the Revised Stipulated Motion filed 6/24/2010. The prior stipulated motion filed on 6/16/2010 is denied as moot. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00249-LSC -FG3, 8:09-cv-00263-LSC-FG3 Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting (36) Stipulated Motion to Extend Expert Witness Disclosure Deadlines in case 8:09-cv-00249-LSC-FG3; granting (37) Stipulated Motion to Extend Expert Witness Disclosure Deadlines in case 8:09-cv-00263-LSC-FG3. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00249-LSC-FG3, 8:09-cv-00263-LSC-FG3Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Cases 8:09cv249 and 8:09cv263 are consolidated for all purposes with 8:09cv249 the "lead case" and 8:09cv263 the "member case." Counsel shall conduct discovery as if these consolidat ed cases are part of a single case. All future filings shall contain the consolidated caption. The court's CM/ECF System has the capacity for "spreading" text among the consolidated cases. The parties are instructed to file all further documents in the lead case, 8:09cv249, and to select the option "yes" in response to the System's question whether to spread the text. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INGWERSEN v. PLANET GROUP INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID D INGWERSEN
Represented By: Clay M. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLANET GROUP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?