Venteicher v. Smyrna Air Center
Plaintiff: George W. Venteicher
Defendant: Smyrna Air Center
Case Number: 8:2009cv00272
Filed: August 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Otoe
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant in the total amount of Ninety Thousand Eighty-four Dollars and 71/100 ($90,084.71), which includes the costs of this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: On or before February 21, 2013, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett, at gossett@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The final pretrial conference set for February 14, 2013 and the jury trial scheduled for March 5, 2013, are cancelled upon the notification that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER - Motions for summary judgment shall be filed not later than December 21,2012. See NECivR 56.1 and 7.0.1. Plaintiff shall disclose his rebuttal expert witnesses by or before September 14, 2012. All depositions, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by December 3, 2012. Motions in limine, including Daubert motions, shall be filed no later than December 21, 2012. Non-expert witnesses and trial exhibits shall be disclosed by January 18, 2013. The Final Pretrial Conference with the undersigned will be held on February 14, 2013 at 9:00 A.M., in chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2210, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. The trial of this matter will comm ence on March 5, 2013, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable F.A. Gossett, United States Magistrate Judge. All other provisions of the Fifth Amended Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of Case (filing 51 ) remain in force and the parties shall govern themselves accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TEL)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 THIRD AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 33 Motion to Extend. Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2011 at 11:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 11/15/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett for final disposition. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that Defendant Smyrna Air Center's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue 5 is denied. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venteicher v. Smyrna Air Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smyrna Air Center
Represented By: Robert E. O'Connor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George W. Venteicher
Represented By: Betty L. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?