Clark v. Brumbaugh & Quandahl et al
Plaintiff: Mary Clark
Defendant: Brumbaugh & Quandahl and Capitol One Bank
Case Number: 8:2009cv00315
Filed: September 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM OPINION - This matter is before the Court on plaintiff Mary Clark's motion for reconsideration 129 and Clark's objection to defendant Brumbaugh & Quandahls (B&Q) bill of costs 137 . The Court finds the motion to reconsider should be denied and the objection to B&Q's bill of costs should be sustained. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION - The Court finds Clark's motion for summary judgment should be denied and B&Q's motion for summary judgment should be granted. A separate order and judgment will be entered in conformance with this opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER - granting 98 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act; granting 101 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. The motions are granted; defendants shall file unredacted indexes of evidence, to which access will be limited to the parties herein and the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 92 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. Plaintiff may file as restricted her unredacted evidence index regarding summary judgment. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER - Defendant Brumbaugh & Quandahl, P.C., L.L.O.'s motion to quash deposition of Kirk E. Brumbaugh, for protective order, and for sanctions 64 is denied in full; Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery responses 69 is granted; B & Q shall produce documents responsive to plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Nos. 5 & 9; Plaintiff's motion to quash notice of deposition of plaintiff Mary Clark 83 is granted; the parties will re-schedule this deposition for a date and time convenient for counsel of all parties; and Plaintiff's motion for status conference 74 is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER - The stipulation of the parties for leave to extend time 73 is granted. Plaintiff shall have until July 7, 2010, to file her reply and oppositions to the motions for summary judgment. Defendants shall have until July 16, 2010, to file their briefs. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2009 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Compel, construed as a motion for protective order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(e). Access to the exhibits in Filings Nos. 7 and 8 shall be restricted to court personnel and counsel of record pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Brumbaugh & Quandahl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brumbaugh & Quandahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol One Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Clark
Represented By: William L. Reinbrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?