Argenyi v. Creighton University
Plaintiff: Michael S. Argenyi
Defendant: Creighton University
Interested Party: United States
Case Number: 8:2009cv00341
Filed: September 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: FA Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2014 Filing 472 MANDATE/JUDGMENT from USCA - 8th Circuit (14-2373 and 14-2494) regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA #453 and Notice of Appeal to USCA, #457 . In accordance with the judgment #471 of 08/20/2014, and pursuant to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter. (JAB)
August 20, 2014 Filing 471 COPY of Judgment from USCA - 8th Circuit(14-2373 and 14-2494). The parties' joint motion to dismiss the appeal is granted. The appeal is hereby dismissed in accordance with the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 42(b).The Court's mandate shall issue forthwith. (JAB) Modified on 8/20/2014 to add second appeal number. (JAB)
July 25, 2014 Filing 470 TRANSMITTAL LETTER - TRANSCRIPT SENT TO USCA - 8th Circuit (14-2373 and 14-2494) regarding Transcript - Unredacted,,,, #467 , Transcript - Unredacted,,,, #462 , Transcript - Unredacted,,,, #464 , Transcript - Unredacted,,,, #468 , Transcript - Unredacted,,,, #469 , Transcript - Unredacted,,,, #465 , Transcript - Unredacted,,,, #460 , Transcript - Unredacted,,,, #466 , Transcript - Unredacted,,,, #461 , Transcript - Unredacted,,,, #463 (GJG)
July 22, 2014 Filing 469 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Master Index of transcripts of jury trial held before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Pages 1 through 8. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - Redaction Request due 8/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2014. (BLF) Modified on 10/22/2014 to remove text regarding restricted access (GJG).
July 22, 2014 Filing 468 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume IX - jury trial proceedings before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on September 4, 2013. Pages 1104 through 1121. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - Redaction Request due 8/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2014. (BLF) Modified on 10/22/2014 to remove text regarding restricted access (GJG).
July 22, 2014 Filing 467 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume VIII - jury trial proceedings before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on September 3, 2013. Page: 1097 through 1103. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - Redaction Request due 8/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2014. (BLF) Modified on 10/22/2014 to remove text regarding restricted access (GJG).
July 22, 2014 Filing 466 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume VII - jury trial proceedings before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on August 30, 2013. Page: 1006 through 1096. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - Redaction Request due 8/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2014. (BLF) Modified on 10/22/2014 to remove text regarding restricted access (GJG).
July 22, 2014 Filing 465 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume VI - jury trial proceedings before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on August 29, 2013. Page: 884 through 1005. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - Redaction Request due 8/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2014. (BLF) Modified on 10/22/2014 to remove text regarding restricted access (GJG).
July 22, 2014 Filing 464 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume V - jury trial proceedings before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on August 28, 2013. Pages 648 through 883. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - Redaction Request due 8/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2014. (BLF) Modified on 10/22/2014 to remove text regarding restricted access (GJG).
July 22, 2014 Filing 463 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume IV - jury trial proceedings before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on August 27, 2013. Pages 455 through 647. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - Redaction Request due 8/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2014. (BLF) Modified on 10/22/2014 to remove text regarding restricted access (GJG).
July 22, 2014 Filing 462 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume III - jury trial proceedings before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on August 23, 2013. Pages 242 through 454. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - Redaction Request due 8/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2014. (BLF) Modified on 10/22/2014 to remove text regarding restricted access (GJG).
July 22, 2014 Filing 461 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume II - jury trial proceedings before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on August 22, 2013. Pages 45 through 242. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - Redaction Request due 8/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2014. (BLF) Modified on 10/22/2014 to remove text regarding restricted access (GJG).
July 22, 2014 Filing 460 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume I - jury trial proceedings before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on August 20, 2013. Pages 1 through 44. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - Redaction Request due 8/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2014. (BLF) Modified on 10/22/2014 to remove text regarding restricted access (GJG).
June 24, 2014 Filing 459 SCHEDULING LETTER from USCA - 8th Circuit (14-2373 and 14-2494) as to Notice of Appeal to USCA #457 and Notice of Appeal to USCA, #453 . Transcript Designation set for 8/4/2014 (if necessary). (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letters)(TCL )
June 19, 2014 Filing 458 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by Clerk to USCA regarding Judgment #425 , Memorandum and Order #424 . Notice of Appeal filed on 6/18/2014 by Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (TCL )
June 18, 2014 Filing 457 NOTICE OF APPEAL regarding Judgment,,, #425 , Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,, #424 by Attorney Mary C. Vargas on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0867-2730361. (Vargas, Mary)
June 17, 2014 Filing 456 REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on August 20, 22-23, 27-30 and September 3-4, 2013 before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Balus, Allison)
June 12, 2014 Filing 455 SCHEDULING LETTER from USCA - 8th Circuit(14-2373) as to Notice of Appeal to USCA #453 . Transcript Designation set for 7/22/2014. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(TCL )
June 9, 2014 Filing 454 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by Clerk to USCA regarding Judgment,, #425 , Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction, #424 . Notice of Appeal to USCA, #453 . Notice of Appeal filed on 6/6/2014 by Defendant Creighton University. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES - FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH THE DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE. (GJG)
June 6, 2014 Filing 453 NOTICE OF APPEAL regarding Judgment,,, #425 , Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,, #424 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0867-2724109. (Moore, Scott)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 452 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS - Argenyi's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Filing No. #442 ) is granted in part as follows: 1. Argenyi is awarded attorneys' fees as the prevailing party in the litigation of the merits of this case in the amount of $449,009.00; 2. Argenyi is awarded nontaxable costs in the amount of $18,998.42; and 3. Argenyi is awarded $10,365.00 for expert fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
April 7, 2014 Filing 451 INDEX in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #442 and Reply Brief by Attorney Mary C. Vargas on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Mary C. Vargas, #2 Exhibit A1 - Time Records of Mary C. Vargas, #3 Exhibit B Letter from US DOJ to Scott Moore, #4 Exhibit C Letter from Scott Moore to Dianne DeLair, #5 Exhibit D Letter from Scott Moore to Mary Vargas, #6 Exhibit E Email from Scott Moore to Mary Vargas, #7 Exhibit F Declaration of Michael Stein, #8 Exhibit F1 Time Records of Michael Stein, #9 Exhibit G Declaration of William Reinbrecht, #10 Exhibit H Declaration of Randolph Bragg, #11 Exhibit I Declaration of Caroline Jackson SIGNED)(Vargas, Mary)
April 7, 2014 Filing 450 REPLY BRIEF in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Attorney Mary C. Vargas on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(Vargas, Mary)
March 31, 2014 Filing 449 INDEX in support of Brief #448 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2, #4 Exhibit A3, #5 Exhibit A4, #6 Exhibit B)(Moore, Scott)
March 31, 2014 Filing 448 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Attorney Fees #442 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 447 TEXT ORDER granting #446 Unopposed Motion to Extend. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees #442 by or before 3/31/2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LRH)
March 21, 2014 Filing 446 Unopposed MOTION to Extend by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
March 19, 2014 Filing 445 Costs Taxed regarding Bill of Costs #430 in amount of $ 10,904.99 against defendant. (BHC)
March 7, 2014 Filing 444 INDEX in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #442 by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exs. A-5, #2 Exs. B-4, #3 Exs. C-2, #4 Exs. D-4, #5 Exs. E-2, #6 Exs. F-K)(DeLair, Dianne)
March 7, 2014 Filing 443 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #442 by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
March 7, 2014 Filing 442 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 441 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff Michael Argenyi's Motion to Enforce the Court's Order Granting Injunctive Relief (Filing No. [437) is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
March 3, 2014 Filing 440 REPLY regarding MOTION Enforce Court's Order #437 by Attorney Mary C. Vargas on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(Vargas, Mary)
February 24, 2014 Filing 439 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION Enforce Court's Order #437 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael Kavan, #2 Exhibit A1 - Clinical Campus Assignment Policy, #3 Exhibit A2 - Email from Kavan to Argenyi dated January 31, 2014, #4 Exhibit A3 - Email from Kavan to Argenyi dated February 3, 2014)(Moore, Scott)
February 11, 2014 Filing 438 BRIEF in support of MOTION Enforce Court's Order #437 by Attorney Mary C. Vargas on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Mary C. Vargas, #2 Exhibit Email Communications, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Michael Argenyi)(Vargas, Mary)
February 11, 2014 Filing 437 MOTION Enforce Court's Order by Attorney Mary C. Vargas on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vargas, Mary)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 436 TEXT ORDER SETTING CONFERENCE CALL: A Telephonic Conference Call has been scheduled for Tuesday, February 11, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. (CST), in Chambers before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 435 TEXT ORDER granting #434 Plaintiff's Motion for a Telephonic Hearing and Extension of Time. A telephonic hearing will be set for a date and time to be determined. Plaintiff shall file his motion for attorneys' fees and costs on or before March 7, 2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (RET)
February 7, 2014 Filing 434 MOTION to Extend and for Telephonic Hearing by Attorney Mary C. Vargas on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vargas, Mary)
February 3, 2014 Filing 433 REPLY regarding Bill of Costs #430 by Attorney Mary C. Vargas on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(Vargas, Mary)
January 28, 2014 Filing 432 TEXT ORDER regarding Bill of Costs #430 filed by Michael S. Argenyi. Plaintiff shall have until February 3, 2014 to file a reply to Defendant's opposition to Plaintiff's Bill of Costs.Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (BHC)
January 24, 2014 Filing 431 NOTICE regarding Bill of Costs #430 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Taxable Costs by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University (Balus, Allison)
January 17, 2014 Filing 430 BILL OF COSTS by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(DeLair, Dianne)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 429 TEXT ORDER granting #428 Second Joint Motion to Extend. The Plaintiff will file his motion for costs on or before February 15, 2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (RET)
December 30, 2013 Filing 428 Joint MOTION to Extend and for Clarification of Order by Attorney Mary C. Vargas on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vargas, Mary)
December 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 427 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time (Filing No. #426 is granted. The Plaintiff will file his motion for attorney's fees on or before February 15, 2014. The parties' time to file any appeals from the Judgment in this case will run from the date of the entry of the order disposing of the motion for attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
December 23, 2013 Filing 426 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines for Filing Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Attorney Mary C. Vargas on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vargas, Mary)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 425 JUDGMENT - Plaintiff Michael Argenyi's Motion for Declaratory, Equitable, and Injunctive Relief (Filing No. #394 ) is granted in part, as follows: Beginning in the fall semester of 2014, and continuing until his graduation or the discontinuation of his enrollment as a medical student, Creighton University will provide Michael Argenyi with auxiliary aids and services for his effective communication, including Communication Access Real-time Transcription (CART) in didactic settings and sign-supported oral interpreters in small group and clinical settings, and the Motion is otherwise denied. The parties shall file any motions pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 50(b), Rule 54(d)(2), Rule 59, or any other post-trial motions pursuant to the deadlines contained by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG, )
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 424 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff Michael Argenyis Motion for Declaratory, Equitable, and Injunctive Relief (Filing No. #394 ) is granted in part, as follows: Beginning in the fall semester of 2014, and continuing until his graduation or the discontinuation of his enrollment as a medical student, Creighton University will provide Michael Argenyi with auxiliary aids and services for his effective communication, including Communication Access Real-time transcription (CART) in didactic settings and sign-supported oral interpreters in small group and clinical settings, and the Motion is otherwise denied. A separate Judgment will be entered. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
December 18, 2013 Filing 423 REPLY BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Permanent Injunction Declaratory and Equitable Relief #394 (Sur-Reply) by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 422 TEXT ORDER granting #421 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief. Defendant shall file its Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory, Equitable, and Injunctive Relief #394 by or before 12/19/2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LRH)
December 17, 2013 Filing 421 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory, Injunctive, and Equitable Relief (Filing No. 394) by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moore, Scott)
December 9, 2013 Filing 420 BRIEF in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory, Injunctive, and Equitable Relief (Reply) by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 419 TEXT ORDER that upon the expiration of the 90 day deadline, the Unredacted #418 shall be available as only a restricted document and not available to the public. Only counsel of record shall receive access to this transcript. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (DKM, )
December 5, 2013 Filing 418 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED)- RESTRICTED pursuant to filing 419 - of trial proceedings before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on September 4, 2013. Pages 1 through 18. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. Redaction Request due 12/26/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2014. (BLF) Modified on 12/5/2013 to reflect this transcript will be restricted and only available to counsel of record upon the expiration of the 90 day deadline (DKM, ). Modified on 3/6/2014 to remove text regarding restricted access (GJG).
December 5, 2013 Filing 417 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of trial proceedings before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on September 3, 2013. Pages 1 through 7. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. Redaction Request due 12/26/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2014. (BLF) Modified on 3/6/2014 to remove text regarding restricted access (GJG).
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 416 TEXT ORDER granting #415 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file a reply brief in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory, Equitable, and Injunctive Relief #394 by or before 12/9/2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LRH)
November 21, 2013 Filing 415 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time for Filing Reply Brief by Attorney Mary C. Vargas on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vargas, Mary)
November 18, 2013 Filing 414 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Permanent Injunction Declaratory and Equitable Relief #394 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
November 18, 2013 Filing 413 INDEX in opposition to MOTION for Permanent Injunction Declaratory and Equitable Relief #394 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, A1, and A2)(Moore, Scott)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 412 TEXT ORDER granting #411 Joint Motion to Extend. Defendant shall file its brief in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion seeking injunctive and equitable relief on or before November 18, 2013. Plaintiff shall file his reply brief in support his Motion on or before December 2, 2013. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (RET)
October 31, 2013 Filing 411 Joint MOTION to Extend by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
October 23, 2013 Filing 410 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of testimony of Michael Argenyi before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on August 27, 2013. Pages 1 through 99. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - Redaction Request due 11/13/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2014. (BLF) Modified on 1/22/2014 to remove restriction text (TCL ).
October 23, 2013 Filing 409 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of testimony of Michael Argenyi before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on August 23, 2013. Pages 1 through 209. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - Redaction Request due 11/13/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2014. (BLF) Modified on 1/22/2014 to remove restriction text(TCL ).
October 23, 2013 Filing 408 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of trial proceedings before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on August 28, 2013. Pages 1 through 236. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - Redaction Request due 11/13/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2014. (BLF) Modified on 1/22/2014 to remove restriction text(TCL ).
October 23, 2013 Filing 407 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Closing Arguments of trial before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on August 30, 3013. Pages 1 through 65. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - Redaction Request due 11/13/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2014. (BLF) Modified on 1/22/2014 to remove restriction text (TCL ).
October 23, 2013 Filing 406 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Opening Statements from trial before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on August 22, 2013. Pages 1 through 33. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - Redaction Request due 11/13/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2014. (BLF) Modified on 1/22/2014 to remove restriction text(TCL ).
October 16, 2013 Filing 405 REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/22/13, 8/23/13, 8/27/13, 8/28/13, 8/30/13 before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
October 16, 2013 Filing 404 INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Motion by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A20 pt. 3)(DeLair, Dianne)
October 16, 2013 Filing 403 INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Motion by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A20 pt. 2)(DeLair, Dianne)
October 16, 2013 Filing 402 INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Motion by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A20 pt. 1)(DeLair, Dianne)
October 16, 2013 Filing 401 INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory, Injunctive and Equitable Relief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A19)(DeLair, Dianne)
October 16, 2013 Filing 400 INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory, Injunctive and Equitable Relief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A18)(DeLair, Dianne)
October 16, 2013 Filing 399 INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory, Injunctive and Equitable Relief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A17)(DeLair, Dianne)
October 16, 2013 Filing 398 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED regarding Index in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory, Injunctive and Equitable Relief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A16, #2 Exhibit A16)(DeLair, Dianne)
October 16, 2013 Filing 397 INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Motion Injunctive, Declaratory and Equitable Relief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1-A10, #2 Exhibit A11-A15)(DeLair, Dianne)
October 15, 2013 Filing 396 INDEX in support of Motion for Injunctive, Declaratory and Equitable Relief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
October 15, 2013 Filing 395 BRIEF in support of Motion for Injunctive, Declaratory and Equitable Relief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
October 15, 2013 Filing 394 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Declaratory and Equitable Relief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
October 15, 2013 Filing 393 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) Partial Transcript - Testimony of Dr. Thomas Hansen before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on August 27, 2013. Pages 1 through 23. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - Redaction Request due 11/5/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/15/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2014. (BLF) Modified on 1/14/2014 to remove text regarding restricted access (GJG).
October 9, 2013 Filing 392 REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on August 27, 2013 before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 391 TEXT ORDER granting #390 Joint Motion to Amend Motion/Briefing Schedule for Post-Trial Motions. Plaintiff shall file his motion seeking injunctive and equitable relief on or before October 14, 2013. Defendant shall file its brief in opposition to Plaintiff's motion on or before November 4, 2013. Plaintiff shall file his reply brief in support of his motion on or before November 18, 2013. The parties shall file any motions pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 50(b), Rule 59, or any other post-trial motions pursuant to the deadlines contained by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure after judgment is entered in this case. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (RET)
September 6, 2013 Filing 390 Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule for Filing Post-Trial Motions by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
September 4, 2013 Filing 389 EXHIBIT RECEIPT - Defendant Creighton University from Jury Trial. (GJG)
September 4, 2013 Filing 388 EXHIBIT RECEIPT - Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi regarding Jury Trial. (GJG)
September 4, 2013 Filing 387 PART 2 OF 2 - FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE Page regarding Jury Verdict #386 . ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). (GJG)
September 4, 2013 Filing 386 JURY VERDICT with foreperson's signature redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act in favor of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. Type of case: Americans with Disabilities Act. - PART 1 OF 2. (GJG)
September 4, 2013 Filing 385 WITNESS LIST from jury trial held On August 20-30, 2013 and September 3-4, 2013. (MLF, )
September 4, 2013 Filing 384 EXHIBIT LIST from jury trial held on August 20-30, 2013 and September 3-4, 2013. (MLF, )
September 4, 2013 Filing 383 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Jury Trial ended on 9/4/2013. Verdict received at 1:15 p.m. for: [X] Plaintiff. Clerk file verdict, but withhold entry of judgment until further order. Number of trial days with evidence - 6 days. Courtroom deputy: Marian Lea Frahm; Reporter: Brenda Fauber; Appearance for plaintiff: Mary C. Vargas, Dianne D. DeLair; Appearance for defendant: Allison D. Balus and Scott P. Moore; Time Start: 8:55 AM; Time Stop: 1:34 PM; Time in Court:19 Minutes. (MLF, )
September 4, 2013 Filing 382 ANSWER TO JURY'S FOURTH QUESTIONS from Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
September 4, 2013 Filing 381 PART 2 OF 2 - FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE Page regarding Jury's Fourth Questions #380 . ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). (GJG)
September 4, 2013 Filing 380 JURY'S FOURTH QUESTIONS to the Court with juror's signature redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act - PART 1 OF 2. (GJG)
September 4, 2013 Filing 379 ANSWER TO JURY'S THIRD QUESTION from Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
September 4, 2013 Filing 378 PART 2 OF 2 - FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE Page regarding Jury's Third Question filing #377 . ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). (GJG)
September 4, 2013 Filing 377 JURY'S THIRD QUESTION to the Court with juror's signature redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act - PART 1 OF 2. (GJG)
September 3, 2013 Filing 376 ANSWER TO JURY'S SECOND QUESTION to the Jury from Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
September 3, 2013 Filing 375 PART 2 OF 2 - FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE Page regarding Jury's Second Questions #374 . ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). (GJG)
September 3, 2013 Filing 374 JURY'S SECOND QUESTION to the Court with juror's signature redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act - PART 1 OF 2. (GJG)
September 3, 2013 Filing 370 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Jury Trial held on 9/3/2013. Jury returned at 5:05 p.m. without verdict. Jury is to separate and to return and resume deliberations on 9/4/2013 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Courtroom deputy: Marian Lea Frahm; Reporter: Brenda Fauber; Appearance for plaintiff: Mary C. Vargas, Caroline E. Jackson, Dianne D. DeLair; Appearance for defendant: Allison D. Balus and Scott P. Moore; Time Start: 9:00Time Stop: 5:05 PM; Time in Court: 0 Hours (MLF, )
September 3, 2013 Filing 369 Jury Instructions. (JB)
August 30, 2013 Filing 373 ANSWER TO JURY'S FIRST QUESTIONS to the Jury from Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
August 30, 2013 Filing 372 PART 2 OF 2 - FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE Page regarding Jury Questions filing #371 . ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). (GJG)
August 30, 2013 Filing 371 JURY'S FIRST QUESTIONS to the Court with juror's signature redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act - PART 1 OF 2. (GJG)
August 30, 2013 Filing 368 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Jury instruction conference held. Plaintiff's motion for a directed verdict is denied. continued to August 30, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. Closing arguments. Instruction conference. Plaintiff's Objection to Proposed Jury Instructions #342 , Objection to Verdict Form #343 and Objection to Proposed Instruction #367 are denied as moot. Defendant's Objection to Proposed Jury Instruction #340 , Objection to Proposed Verdict Form #341 are denied as moot. Jury received case at 12:31 PM; Jury resumed deliberations on September 3, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Courtroom deputy: Marian Lea Frahm; Reporter: Brenda Fauber; Appearance for plaintiff: Mary C. Vargas, Caroline E. Jackson, Dianne D. DeLair; Appearance for defendant: Allison D. Balus and Scott P. Moore; Time Start: 9:10 AM; Time Stop: 5:05 PM; Time in Court: 3 Hour 45 Minutes (MLF, )
August 29, 2013 Filing 367 OBJECTION to Proposed Jury Instructions #362 by Attorney Michael S. Stein on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(Stein, Michael)
August 29, 2013 Filing 366 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp Jury Trial held on 8/29/2013. Evidence by plaintiff and defendant. Defense rests. Plaintiff offered rebuttal evidence and rests. Trial not concluded - continued to August 30, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Courtroom deputy: Marian Lea Frahm; Reporter: Brenda Fauber; Appearance for plaintiff: Mary C. Vargas, Caroline E. Jackson, Dianne D. DeLair; Appearance for defendant: Allison D. Balus and Scott P. Moore; Time Start: 9:06 AM;Time Stop: 12:18 PM Time in Court: 3 Hour 15 Minutes (MLF, )
August 28, 2013 Filing 365 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Jury Trial held on 8/28/2013. Evidence by plaintiff and defendant. Plaintiff rests. Trial not concluded - continued to August 29, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Courtroom deputy: Marian Lea Frahm; Reporter: Brenda Fauber; Appearance for plaintiff: Mary C. Vargas, Caroline E. Jackson, Dianne D. DeLair; Appearance for defendant: Allison D. Balus and Scott P. Moore; Time Start: 9:18 AM; Time Stop: 4:59 PM; Time in Court: 5 Hour 2 Minutes (MLF, ) Modified on 8/29/2013 to correct date(MLF, ).
August 28, 2013 Filing 364 RETURN of service of Subpoena to Appear and Testify at a Hearing or Trial in a Civil Action (Executed) on 8/27/2013 upon Victoria Deuel by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Balus, Allison)
August 28, 2013 Filing 363 RETURN of service of Subpoena to Appear and Testify at a Hearing or Trial in a Civil Action (unexecuted) on 8/27/2013 upon Victoria Deuel by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Balus, Allison)
August 28, 2013 Filing 362 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Supplemental) by Creighton University. (Balus, Allison)
August 27, 2013 Filing 361 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Jury Trial held on 8/27/2013. Evidence by plaintiff and defendant. Trial not concluded - continued to August 28, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Courtroom deputy: Marian Lea Frahm; Reporter: Brenda Fauber; Appearance for plaintiff: Mary C. Vargas, Caroline E. Jackson, Dianne D. DeLair; Appearance for defendant: Allison D. Balus and Scott P. Moore; Time Start: 9:00 AM; Time Stop: 4:52 PM; Time in Court: 5 Hour 57 Minutes. (MLF, )
August 23, 2013 Filing 360 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Jury Trial held on 8/23/2013. Hearing held in Omaha. Evidence by Plaintiff. Trial continued to August 27, 2013 at 9:00 a.m.. Courtroom Deputy: Mary Roundtree; Reporter: Brenda Fauber; Appearance for Plaintiff: Mary C. Vargas, Caroline E. Jackson, Dianne D. DeLair : Appearance for Defendant: Allison D. Balus and Scott P. Moore. Jury Trial set for 8/27/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Time Start: 9:09 AM; Time Stop: 4:40 PM; Time in Court: 7 hours 31 Minutes. (MKR)
August 22, 2013 Filing 359 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Jury Trial began on 8/22/2013. Opening Statements. Evidence by Plaintiff. Trial continued to 8/23/2013. Hearing held in Omaha. Courtroom Deputy: Mary Roundtree; Reporter: Brenda Fauber; Appearance for Plaintiff: Caroline E. Jackson, Dianne D. DeLair, Mary C. Vargas: Appearance for Defendant: Allison D. Balus and Scott P. Moore. ASL Interpreters: Pamela Duncan and Jamy Elker. Time Start: 9:09 AM; Time Stop: 4:24 PM; Time in Court: 7 Hours and 15 Minutes. (MKR) Modified on 8/23/2013 to include interpreters (MKR).
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 358 TEXT ORDER that Defendant Creighton University's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Reference to Accommodations and Auxiliary Aids and Services #356 is granted. Plaintiff and his counsel will offer no testimony, evidence or argument regarding any auxiliary aids or accommodations Plaintiff may have received or is currently receiving at Boston University. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (RET)
August 21, 2013 Filing 357 BRIEF in support of MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Reference to Accommodations and Auxiliary Aids and Services #356 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
August 21, 2013 Filing 356 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Reference to Accommodations and Auxiliary Aids and Services by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
August 20, 2013 Filing 355 JURY PANEL RECORD. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT. ACCESS IS LIMITED TO COUNSEL OF RECORD AND THE COURT. (GJG)
August 20, 2013 Remark - Public: Jurors reported for trial. (MKR)
August 20, 2013 Filing 354 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Jury Selection held on 8/20/2013. Jury Impaneled. Trial continued to 8/22/2013. The court grants the #349 Motion for Clarification. The #352 Motion for Reconsideration is denied without prejudice. The parties' #353 Stipulation was approved. Hearing held in Omaha. Courtroom Deputy: Mary Roundtree; Reporter: Brenda Fauber; Appearance for Plaintiff: Mary C. Vargas, Dianne D. DeLair, Caroline E. Jackson: Appearance for Defendant: Allison D. Balus and Scott P. Moore; Time Start: 9:56 AM; Time Stop: 11:44 AM; Time in Court: 1 Hour 48 Minutes. (MKR)
August 19, 2013 Filing 353 Joint STIPULATION as to the admissibility of evidence at trial by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 19, 2013 Filing 352 MOTION for Reconsideration by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw (filing #346 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Jeffrey Miller's appearance as counsel for Plaintiff and shall terminate future notices to Mr. Miller is this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG )
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Plaintiff Michael Argenyi's Motion in Limine (Filing No. #279 ) is granted in part as set forth in this order. The Defendant Creighton University's Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (Filing No. #344 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
August 19, 2013 Filing 349 MOTION for Clarification by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 348 TEXT ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion requesting CART services for his attorney Michael S. Stein #333 is granted, as follows: The Court will provide CART services to Michael S. Stein, with a laptop separate from that used by his client, Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi, to the extent practicable. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (RET)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 347 TEXT ORDER denying #287 Motion in Limine. Defendant's Supplemental Motion in Limine or, in the Alternative, for Leave to Depose Witness (Filing No. #287 ) is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (RET)
August 19, 2013 Filing 346 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Jeffrey A. Miller) by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 18, 2013 Filing 345 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (Defendant's Proposed Conclusions of Law) by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Balus, Allison)
August 18, 2013 Filing 344 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Sur-Reply Brief))(Balus, Allison)
August 16, 2013 Filing 343 OBJECTION to Verdict Form by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 16, 2013 Filing 342 OBJECTION to Proposed Jury Instructions by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 16, 2013 Filing 341 OBJECTION to Proposed Verdict Form #327 by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Balus, Allison)
August 16, 2013 Filing 340 OBJECTION to Proposed Jury Instructions #328 by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Balus, Allison)
August 16, 2013 Filing 339 BRIEF Plaintiff's Response to Trial Brief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 16, 2013 Filing 338 PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Moore, Scott)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 337 TEXT ORDER granting #332 Motion for Leave. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Trial Brief (Filing No. #332 ) is granted. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (RET)
August 15, 2013 Filing 336 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (DeLair, Dianne)
August 15, 2013 Filing 335 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Balus, Allison)
August 15, 2013 Filing 334 PARTY RESPONSE to Request for Video Recording on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi, Defendant Creighton University.(MLF, )
August 15, 2013 Filing 333 MOTION CART for Plaintiff's attorney by Attorney Michael S. Stein on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael Stein)(Stein, Michael)
August 15, 2013 Filing 332 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Trial Brief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DeLair, Dianne)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER - The Defendant's Motion to Limit Use of Communications Access Realtime Transcription During Trial (Filing No. #320 ) is denied. The Court may provide the Plaintiff with access to CART services during trial. If the Plaintiff chooses to use CART services during trial, as provided by the Court or otherwise, he will be seated at the west side of the west counsel table, away from the view of the jury, to minimize the likelihood that the jury will be distracted or unduly influenced by his use of such service. Counsel for the parties will make no reference to the Plaintiffs use of CART services in the presence of the jury. Defense counsel may request a limiting instruction from the Court to the jury regarding the Plaintiff's use of CART services during the proceedings. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 330 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant Creighton University's Motion in Limine (Filing No. #277 ) is granted in part, as follows: a. Dr. Esther Argenyi may offer testimony only as a lay witness, consistent with this opinion; b. Dr. Robert Pollard is excluded as a trial witness; c. Dr. Christopher Moreland may offer testimony only as a lay witness, consistent with this opinion; d. All witnesses are precluded from offering opinions about what the law requires, or at any time may have required; e. Plaintiff will offer no testimony, other evidence, or argument about other lawsuits or complaints against Creighton, without first obtaining leave of Court; f. Plaintiff will offer no testimony, other evidence, or argument about pretrial matters, such as discovery, discovery disputes, pretrial rulings, or assertions of privilege; g. Counsel for Plaintiff will make no argument to the jury regarding proposed injunctive relief; h. Plaintiff will offer no testimony, other evidence, or argument about settlement negotiations. The Motion is otherwise denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
August 13, 2013 Filing 329 PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (DeLair, Dianne)
August 13, 2013 Filing 328 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Michael S. Argenyi. (DeLair, Dianne)
August 13, 2013 Filing 327 PROPOSED VERDICT FORM by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (DeLair, Dianne)
August 13, 2013 Filing 326 BRIEF Plaintiff's Trial Brief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 13, 2013 Filing 325 PROPOSED VERDICT FORM by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Balus, Allison)
August 13, 2013 Filing 324 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Creighton University. (Balus, Allison)
August 13, 2013 Filing 323 BRIEF - Defendant's Trial Brief by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Balus, Allison)
August 13, 2013 Filing 322 INDEX in support of MOTION to Exclude (Limit) the Use of Communications Access Realtime Transcription at Trial #320 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1)(Moore, Scott)
August 13, 2013 Filing 321 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Exclude (Limit) the Use of Communications Access Realtime Transcription at Trial #320 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
August 13, 2013 Filing 320 MOTION to Exclude (Limit) the Use of Communications Access Realtime Transcription at Trial by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
August 13, 2013 Filing 319 REPLY BRIEF in opposition to (Sur-Reply) Defendant's Motion in Limine by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 318 TEXT ORDER granting #314 Motion for Leave. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur Reply (Filing No. #314 ) is granted. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (RET)
August 12, 2013 Filing 317 INDEX in opposition to Defendant's Supplemental Motion in Limine by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, A1-A4)(DeLair, Dianne)
August 12, 2013 Filing 316 BRIEF in opposition to Supplemental MOTION in Limine or, in the Alternative, for Leave to Depose Witness #287 by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 12, 2013 Filing 315 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Strike MOTION for Protective Order #292 by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 12, 2013 Filing 314 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DeLair, Dianne)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Plaintiff's Motion to Strike/Motion for Protective Order (Filing No. #292 ) is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER - The parties and their counsel are referred to Rule 3-503.6 of the Nebraska Rules of Professional Conduct, and will refrain from making public comment regarding the law applicable to this case, or regarding evidence that may be presented in this case, until the jury has returned its verdict, or until further order of the Court. Failure to abide by this Order may result in appropriate sanctions including, but not limited to, assessment of costs for the calling of additional jurors as needed to supplement the jury pool due to jurors' exposure to pretrial publicity initiated by the parties or their counsel or in which the parties or their counsel have participated. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
August 11, 2013 Filing 311 INDEX in support of MOTION in Limine #277 by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Moore Declaration), #2 Exhibit A1 (Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures))(Balus, Allison)
August 11, 2013 Filing 310 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION in Limine #277 by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Balus, Allison)
August 9, 2013 Filing 309 REPLY BRIEF in support of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 9, 2013 Filing 308 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #269 by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 9, 2013 Filing 307 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Caroline E. Jackson has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL )
August 9, 2013 Filing 306 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Caroline E. Jackson on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (TCL )
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL JURY TRIAL) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
August 8, 2013 Filing 304 RETURN of service of Subpoena on August 7, 2013 upon Jan Madsen by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 7, 2013 Filing 303 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Caroline E. Jackson for Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (GJG)
August 6, 2013 Filing 302 RETURN of service of Subpoena on August 1, 2013 upon Thomas Hansen, Floyd Knoop, Michael Kavan, Alice Smith, Jodi Lange by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 5, 2013 Filing 301 INDEX in opposition to MOTION to Strike MOTION for Protective Order #292 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-A4)(Moore, Scott)
August 5, 2013 Filing 300 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Strike MOTION for Protective Order #292 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
August 2, 2013 Filing 299 INDEX in opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(DeLair, Dianne)
August 2, 2013 Filing 298 BRIEF in opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 2, 2013 Filing 297 INDEX in opposition to MOTION in Limine #279 by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and A1-A5)(Balus, Allison)
August 2, 2013 Filing 296 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION in Limine #279 by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Balus, Allison)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief (Filing No. #291 ) is granted, and the Plaintiff will file his Reply Brief (Filing No. 291-1) as a separate docket entry. The Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant's Assertion of Fundamental Alteration and Academic Deference (Filing No. #269 ), construed as a motion in limine, is granted in part as follows: a. Defendant Creighton University will not present evidence or argument asserting the defense of "fundamental alteration," suggesting that Argenyi's requested accommodations would fundamentally alter the medical school curriculum in the clinical setting or otherwise; b. Defendant Creighton University will not present evidence or argument asserting the defense of "direct threat," suggesting that Argenyi's requested accommodations in the clinical setting would pose a threat to the health and safety of patients; and c. The Motion is otherwise denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
July 30, 2013 Filing 294 INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike/Motion for Protective Order by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(DeLair, Dianne)
July 30, 2013 Filing 293 BRIEF in support of Motion to Strike/Motion for Protective Order by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
July 30, 2013 Filing 292 MOTION to Strike , MOTION for Protective Order by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
July 30, 2013 Filing 291 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief)(DeLair, Dianne) Modified on 7/30/2013 to correct title of pleading (JSF).
July 29, 2013 Filing 290 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #269 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
July 29, 2013 Filing 289 INDEX in support of Supplemental MOTION in Limine or, in the Alternative, for Leave to Depose Witness #287 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - A4)(Moore, Scott)
July 29, 2013 Filing 288 BRIEF in support of Supplemental MOTION in Limine or, in the Alternative, for Leave to Depose Witness #287 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
July 29, 2013 Filing 287 Supplemental MOTION in Limine or, in the Alternative, for Leave to Depose Witness by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 286 PRETRIAL ORDER - estimated length of trial is 4 days; Jury Trial set for 8/20/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
July 24, 2013 Filing 285 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for telephone conference held before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett on 7/24/2013. Mary Vargas and Dianne DeLair represented the plaintiff. Scott P. Moore represented the defendant. Discussion held regarding pretrial documents. Documents to be submitted by noon on 7/25/2013. (ARL, )
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 284 TEXT ORDER granting 283 Oral Motion for a Telephone Conference with Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett regarding the pretrial documents. A telephone conference is set for 7/24/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett, to be arranged by counsel for plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
July 24, 2013 Filing 283 TEXT ORAL MOTION - for a telephone conference with Magistrate Judge Gossett, by Attorney Mary C. Vargas on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi, regarding pretrial documents.(ARL, )
July 22, 2013 Filing 282 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY in chambers proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett on 7/22/2013. Counsel appeared for final pretrial conference. Dianne DeLair and Mary Vargas represented the plaintiff. Scott P. Moore and Allison Balus represented the defendant. Pretrial conference held. Revised documents to be submitted on or before noon on 7/24/2013. (ARL, )
July 19, 2013 Filing 281 INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(DeLair, Dianne)
July 19, 2013 Filing 280 BRIEF in support of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
July 19, 2013 Filing 279 MOTION in Limine by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
July 19, 2013 Filing 278 BRIEF in support of MOTION in Limine #277 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Appendix iso Motion in Limine, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A -A1)(Moore, Scott)
July 19, 2013 Filing 277 MOTION in Limine by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER: The Defendant's Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Compensatory Damages and Motion to Strike Jury Demand #258 is denied; and The Defendant's Motion for Leave #273 requesting leave to file a reply brief in support of its renewed motion for partial summary judgment is denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 275 TEXT ORDER - The Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant's Assertion of Fundamental Alteration and Academic Deference #269 , in which the Plaintiff seeks to "preclude Defendant from introducing evidence or making mention of fundamental alteration and academic deference at trial," is construed as a motion in limine. Defendant Creighton University may submit a brief in response to the motion on or before July 29, 2013. No reply brief will be permitted. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
July 18, 2013 Filing 274 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Compensatory Damages and Motion to Strike Jury Demand (Renewed) #258 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index iso Defendant's Reply Brief iso Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Compensatory Damages and to Strike Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A - A3)(Moore, Scott)
July 18, 2013 Filing 273 MOTION for Leave from Order (Filing No. 260) to File Reply Brief in Support of Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Compensatory Damages and to Strike Jury Demand by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
July 17, 2013 Filing 271 INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(DeLair, Dianne)
July 17, 2013 Filing 270 BRIEF in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
July 17, 2013 Filing 269 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
July 12, 2013 Filing 268 INDEX in opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1-A23)(DeLair, Dianne)
July 12, 2013 Filing 267 BRIEF in opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
July 12, 2013 Filing 266 STATEMENT regarding: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Compensatory Damages and Motion to Strike Jury Demand (Renewed) #258 , Brief, #259 by Attorney Laurie A. Kelly, William F. Lynch on behalf of Interested Party United States.(Kelly, Laurie)
July 2, 2013 Filing 265 EXHIBIT LIST by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Moore, Scott)
July 2, 2013 Filing 264 WITNESS LIST by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Moore, Scott)
July 2, 2013 Filing 263 WITNESS LIST by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (DeLair, Dianne)
July 2, 2013 Filing 262 EXHIBIT LIST by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (DeLair, Dianne)
July 1, 2013 Filing 261 LETTER to the parties regarding the 7/22/2013 Pretrial Conference with Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER that 1. The Plaintiff shall respond to the Defendant's Motion #258 on or before July 12, 2013; and 2. No reply brief will be permitted. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
June 28, 2013 Filing 259 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Compensatory Damages and Motion to Strike Jury Demand (Renewed) #258 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
June 28, 2013 Filing 258 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Compensatory Damages and Motion to Strike Jury Demand (Renewed) by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Defendant Creighton University's Renewed Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony (Filing No. #248 ) is granted in part, as follows: a. The Motion is granted with respect to testimony of Plaintiff's designated expert witness, Gail Peoples, in Plaintiff's case-in-chief; b. The Motion is granted with respect to opinion testimony of Plaintiff's designated expert witness, Richard Okamoto, in Plaintiff's case-in-chief, although he may present testimony as a fact witness. The Motion is otherwise denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
June 20, 2013 Filing 256 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony (Renewed) #248 by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index iso Reply Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B and B1)(Balus, Allison)
June 20, 2013 Filing 255 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Order on Appeal to Magistrate Judge Order #254 is stricken for the following reason: the document is a duplicate of document number #253 . Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 STRICKEN - ORDER that the Statement of Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order #245 filed by Plaintiff Michal S. Argenyi is overruled. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KMG) Modified on 6/20/2013 to strike pursuant to text order 255 (KMG).
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Statement of Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order (Filing No. #245 ) filed by Plaintiff Michal S. Argenyi is overruled. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
June 14, 2013 Filing 252 BRIEF in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
June 6, 2013 Filing 251 REPLY BRIEF in support of Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
May 31, 2013 Filing 250 INDEX in support of MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony (Renewed) #248 by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1 - A3, #2 Exhibit A4 -A5, #3 Exhibit A6-A7)(Balus, Allison)
May 31, 2013 Filing 249 BRIEF in support of MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony (Renewed) #248 by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Balus, Allison)
May 31, 2013 Filing 248 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony (Renewed) by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Balus, Allison)
May 30, 2013 Filing 247 BRIEF in opposition to Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order Striking Dr. Pollard by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
May 16, 2013 Filing 246 INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Statement of Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(DeLair, Dianne)
May 16, 2013 Filing 245 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER Filing #206 by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
May 14, 2013 Filing 244 NOTIFICATION of Request for Video Recording by Clerk.(MLF, )
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 243 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2013 at 11:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 8/20/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 242 TEXT ORDER. On the court's own motion, the Status Conference is rescheduled to 5/6/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett, to be held by telephone call initiated by counsel for the plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 TEXT ORDER. On the court's own motion, the Status Conference is rescheduled to 4/18/2013 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. The status conference will be held by telephone call arranged by counsel for plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: A Status Conference is set for 4/12/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. The conference will be held by telephone call initiated by counsel for the plaintiff.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
March 13, 2013 Filing 239 MANDATE/JUDGMENT from USCA - 8th Circuit [11-3336 and 11-3461]. In accordance with the opinion and judgment of 1/15/13 which reversed and remanded the case for further proceedings pursuant to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), the formal mandate is hereby issued regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA and #224 and Notice of Appeal to USCA #228 . (MKR)
March 6, 2013 Filing 238 COPY of Amended Order from USCA - 8th Circuit(11-3336 and 11-3461) This order amends the previous order entered March 5, 2013 to show the recusal of Chief Judge Riley and Judge Colloton. The petition for rehearing en banc is denied. The petition for rehearing by the panel is also denied. Chief Judge Riley and Judge Colloton did not participate in the consideration or decision of this matter. (TCL )
March 5, 2013 Filing 237 COPY of Order from USCA - 8th Circuit (11-3336 and 11-3461) The petition for rehearing en banc is denied. The petition for rehearing by the panel is also denied. (TCL ) Modified on 3/6/2013 to add appeal case number (TCL ).
January 15, 2013 Filing 236 COPY of Order (Judgment) from USCA - 8th Circuit (11-3336/3461). These appeals from the United States District Court were submitted on the record of the district court, briefs of the parties and was argued by counsel. After consideration, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is reversed and the cause is remanded to the district court for proceedings consistent with the opinion of this court. (GJG)
January 15, 2013 Filing 235 COPY of Opinion of USCA - 8th Circuit (11-3336/3461) regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA,, #224 , and Notice of Appeal to USCA #228 . Accordingly, we reverse the summary judgment granted to Creighton and remand for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Letter to West Publishing)(GJG)
March 6, 2012 Filing 234 COPY of Order from USCA - 8th Circuit (11-3336; 11-3461) - Appellee-cross-appellant's motion to file an overlength reply brief of 17,000 words is granted. The court draws counsels attention to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 28.1(e)(2)(b)(i).(GJG)
January 27, 2012 Filing 233 COPY of Order from USCA - 8th Circuit (11-3336) (11-3461). Alexander Graham Bell Association for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing and National Disability Rights Network have filed a motion for permission to file an amicus brief and has tendered a proposed amicus brief on behalf of Appellant. The parties are hereby notified that they have eight (8) days from the date of this order to file objections to the motion. If at the end of that time no objections have been filed, the motion will be granted, and the brief will be filed. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (AOA)
January 27, 2012 Filing 232 COPY of Order from USCA - 8th Circuit (11-3336) (11-3461) - The Association of Medical Professionals with Hearing Losses has filed a motion for permission to file an amicus brief and has tendered a proposed amicus brief on behalf of Appellant. The parties are hereby notified that they have eight (8) days from the date of this order to file objections to the motion. If at the end of that time no objections have been filed, the motion will be granted, and the brief will be filed. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (AOA)
December 9, 2011 Filing 231 Transmittal Letter to USCA 8th Circuit(11-3461) of electronic copy of transcript of TRO hearing filed 3/9/2011. (JAB)
November 14, 2011 Filing 230 SCHEDULING LETTER from USCA - 8th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA, #224 and Notice of Cross Appeal to USCA #228 . Cross appeal has been assigned case number 11-3461. The briefing schedule established today supersedes all other schedules. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(JAB)
November 10, 2011 Filing 229 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by Clerk to USCA regarding Notice of Appeal #228 of Costs Taxed #225 . Notice of Appeal filed on 11/09/2011 by Defendant Creighton University. This is a cross appeal regarding your case 11-3336. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES - FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH THE DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL - SUBMIT FORMS A & B TO EIGHTH CIRCUIT CLERKS OFFICE. (JAB)
November 10, 2011 TEXT ENTRY THAT APPEAL fee paid by attorney Christopher R. Hedican on behalf of defendant Creighton University in the amount of $ 455.00, with receipt number 4-5024, regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA #228 . (TEL)
November 9, 2011 Filing 228 NOTICE OF APPEAL regarding Costs Taxed #225 Cross Appeal by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University (Moore, Scott)
October 27, 2011 Filing 227 SCHEDULING LETTER from USCA - 8th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA #224 . Case has been assigned number 11-3336. Transcript Designation set for 12/6/2011. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(JAB)
October 24, 2011 Filing 226 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by Clerk to USCA regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA #224 of Order #206 , Memorandum and Order #221 and Judgment #222 . Notice of Appeal filed on 10/21/2011 by Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. Appellant's Form A is attached to the Notice of Appeal #224 . NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES - FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH THE DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE. (JAB)
October 24, 2011 Filing 225 Costs Taxed regarding Bill of Costs #223 . Defendant's request for costs denied. (GA)
October 21, 2011 Filing 224 NOTICE OF APPEAL regarding Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Appeal to Magistrate Judge Order, Order on Motion for Leave,,,,,,,,,, #221 , Judgment, #222 , Order on Motion to Strike,,, #206 by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0867-2144835. by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (Attachments: #1 Form A)(DeLair, Dianne)
October 21, 2011 Filing 223 BILL OF COSTS by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allison Balus, #2 Exhibit A)(Balus, Allison)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 222 JUDGMENT - In accordance with the Memorandum and Order filing #221 , Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant Creighton University, and against Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. All claims brought by the Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi are dismissed with prejudice. The parties will bear their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. #186 ) is denied. The Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. #183 ) is granted. Defendant's Motion in Limine (Filing No. #180 ), Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judges Order (Filing No. #214 ), and Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief (Filing No. #215 ) are denied as moot. This action is dismissed, with prejudice. The Court will file a separate Judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
September 19, 2011 Filing 220 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Jeffrey A. Miller for Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JAB)
September 19, 2011 Filing 219 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Jeffrey A. Miller on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (JAB)
September 14, 2011 Filing 218 BRIEF in opposition to OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Expert Witness Dr. Robert Pollard #214 by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Davidson, Steven)
September 9, 2011 Filing 217 STATUS REPORT by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Davidson, Steven)
September 9, 2011 Filing 216 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Creighton University (Davidson, Steven)
August 31, 2011 Filing 215 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeLair, Dianne)
August 29, 2011 Filing 214 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Expert Witness Dr. Robert Pollard by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 24, 2011 Filing 213 Certificate of Service by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 22, 2011 Filing 212 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #186 Reply by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 22, 2011 Filing 211 INDEX in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment #183 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibits C1-C5)(Moore, Scott)
August 22, 2011 Filing 210 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment #183 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
August 19, 2011 Filing 209 Certificate regarding Order on Motion to Compel,, #208 - Certificate of Service by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel #161 . By or before August 26 2011, Defendant shall provide Plaintiff with copies of the documents specifically listed above. To the extent that Plaintiff's motion to compel seeks the production of the remaining documents listed on Defendant's privilege log, it is denied. A party may object to a magistrate judge's order by filing a Statement of Objections to Magistrate Judges Order. Any objection to this order must be submitted on or before August 26, 2011. The objecting party must comply with the requirements of NECivR 72.2. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAB)
August 17, 2011 Filing 207 Certificate regarding Order on Motion to Compel,,,, #201 - Certificate of Service by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Designation and Supplemental Designation (filing #144 ) is granted. Plaintiff's expert designation and supplemental designation of Dr. Robert Pollard is hereby stricken. Dr. Pollard may not testify as an expert witness in this case. Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Designation of Dr. Carolyn Stern and Dr. Christopher Moreland (filing #153 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
August 11, 2011 Filing 205 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Supplemental Index for Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT. ACCESS IS LIMITED TO COUNSEL OF RECORD AND THE COURT) - by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (supplemental), #2 Exhibit A47-48, #3 Exhibit A49, #4 Exhibit A50)(DeLair, Dianne)
August 11, 2011 Filing 204 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT. ACCESS IS LIMITED TO COUNSEL OF RECORD AND THE COURT) - by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 11, 2011 Filing 203 INDEX in opposition to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #186 by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (Declaration of A. Balus), #2 Exhibit B1 through B4, #3 Exhibit B5, #4 Exhibit B6 through B8)(Balus, Allison)
August 11, 2011 Filing 202 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #186 by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Balus, Allison)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part Defendant's Motion to Compel #158 . Plaintiff shall produce all documents responsive to Defendant's discovery request which were exchanged between Plaintiff and the United States before September 24, 2010. On or before August 24, 2011, Plaintiff shall provide Defendant with a privilege log. If disputed, a motion to compel must be filed on or before August 31, 2011. On or before August 17, 2011, Defendant shall produce to the court the thirty-three documents listed on Defendant's privilege log for in camera inspection. After reviewing the documents, the court will enter an order on Plaintiff's motion to compel. Defendant shall conduct further investigation into the existence of documents responsive to Plaintiff's discovery requests, and, in particular, MEMT meeting notes and agendas. To the extent that other documents exist, Defendant is ordered to supplement its discovery responses/privilege log accordingly. Defendant shall provide the court with a status report detailing the results of its inspection on or before September 9, 2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JAB)
August 9, 2011 Filing 200 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Index of Plaintiff's Exhibits in Support of Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT. ACCESS IS LIMITED TO COUNSEL OF RECORD AND THE COURT) - by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, A1-A4, #2 Exhibit A5, #3 Exhibit A6-A8, #4 Exhibit A9-A10, #5 Exhibit A11-A12, #6 Exhibit A13-A15, #7 Exhibit A16-A18, #8 Exhibit A19-A25, #9 Exhibit A26, #10 Exhibit A27-A35, #11 Exhibit A36-A39, #12 Exhibit A40-A42, #13 Exhibit A44, #14 Exhibit A45, #15 Exhibit A45, #16 Exhibit A45, #17 Exhibit A46)(DeLair, Dianne)
August 8, 2011 Filing 199 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Index in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition Brief to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT. ACCESS IS LIMITED TO COUNSEL OF RECORD AND THE COURT) - by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 8, 2011 Filing 198 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Plainttif's Brief in Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT. ACCESS IS LIMITED TO COUNSEL OF RECORD AND THE COURT) - by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 8, 2011 Filing 197 INDEX in support of Reply Brief For Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Supplemental) by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L)(DeLair, Dianne)
August 8, 2011 Filing 196 INDEX in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel (Supplemental Index) by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(DeLair, Dianne)
August 1, 2011 Filing 195 INDEX in support of MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony #180 , Reply Brief #194 by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits B and B1)(Balus, Allison)
August 1, 2011 Filing 194 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony #180 by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Balus, Allison)
July 25, 2011 Filing 193 INDEX in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #186 Supplemental by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A25)(DeLair, Dianne)
July 22, 2011 Filing 192 INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2, #4 Exhibit A3, #5 Exhibit A4, #6 Exhibit A5, #7 Exhibit A6)(DeLair, Dianne)
July 22, 2011 Filing 191 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony #180 by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 190 THIRD AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF A CIVIL CASE - To allow sufficient time for briefing and ruling on the motions for summary judgment, the trial will be rescheduled. Unexpired deadlines will be extended. Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2011 at 01:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 11/15/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
July 19, 2011 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED regarding Index #189 . CDs MAINTAINED IN CLERK'S OFFICE. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO PDF DOCUMENT IS ATTACHED (KBJ)
July 19, 2011 Filing 189 INDEX in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment #183 (Supplemental) by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
July 19, 2011 Filing 188 INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2, #4 Exhibit A3, #5 Exhibit A5, #6 Exhibit A6-A10, #7 Exhibit A11-A15, #8 Exhibit A16-A20, #9 Exhibit A21-A23, #10 Exhibit A24, #11 Exhibit A25)(DeLair, Dianne)
July 19, 2011 Filing 187 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #186 by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
July 18, 2011 Filing 186 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
July 18, 2011 Filing 185 INDEX in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment #183 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A, A1-A3, #2 Exhibits A4-A13, #3 Exhibits A14-A31)(Moore, Scott)
July 18, 2011 Filing 184 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment #183 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
July 18, 2011 Filing 183 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
July 8, 2011 Filing 182 INDEX in support of MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony #180 by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Allison Balus, #2 Exhibits A1 - A3, #3 Exhibits A4 - A5, #4 Exhibits A6 - A7)(Balus, Allison)
July 8, 2011 Filing 181 BRIEF in support of MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony #180 by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Balus, Allison)
July 8, 2011 Filing 180 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Balus, Allison)
June 29, 2011 Filing 179 Certificate of Service by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
June 27, 2011 Filing 178 Certificate of Service by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
June 24, 2011 Filing 177 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel #158 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
June 20, 2011 Filing 176 INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Reply Brief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Affidavit Dianne DeLair, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(DeLair, Dianne)
June 20, 2011 Filing 175 BRIEF in support of Reply Brief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
June 14, 2011 Filing 174 INDEX in support of Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dianne D. DeLair, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(DeLair, Dianne)
June 14, 2011 Filing 173 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Compel #158 by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
June 14, 2011 Filing 172 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jan Madsen by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (DeLair, Dianne)
June 13, 2011 Filing 171 INDEX in support of MOTION to Strike Certificate #148 Plaintiff's Designation of Dr. Carolyn Stern and Dr. Christpoher Moreland #153 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A1-A2)(Moore, Scott)
June 13, 2011 Filing 170 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Strike Certificate #148 Plaintiff's Designation of Dr. Carolyn Stern and Dr. Christpoher Moreland #153 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
June 13, 2011 Filing 169 INDEX in opposition to MOTION to Compel Production of Documents #161 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A1-A6)(Moore, Scott)
June 13, 2011 Filing 168 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Compel Production of Documents #161 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
June 12, 2011 Filing 167 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Beth Ellsworth by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University (Moore, Scott)
June 7, 2011 Filing 166 INDEX in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dianne D. DeLair, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(DeLair, Dianne)
June 7, 2011 Filing 165 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Strike Certificate #148 Plaintiff's Designation of Dr. Carolyn Stern and Dr. Christpoher Moreland #153 by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
June 3, 2011 Filing 164 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Floyd Knoop by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (DeLair, Dianne)
June 1, 2011 Filing 163 INDEX in support of Motion to Compel by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(DeLair, Dianne)
June 1, 2011 Filing 162 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel Production of Documents #161 by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
June 1, 2011 Filing 161 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
May 31, 2011 Filing 160 INDEX in support of MOTION to Compel #158 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Scott P. Moore, #2 Exhibits A1-A5)(Moore, Scott)
May 31, 2011 Filing 159 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel #158 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
May 31, 2011 Filing 158 MOTION to Compel by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
May 25, 2011 Filing 157 INDEX in support of MOTION to Strike Certificate #125 , Notice (Other) #140 Plaintiff's Expert Designation and Supplemental Designation #144 of Dr. Robert Pollard by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Scott P. Moore, #2 Exhibits A1-A5)(Moore, Scott)
May 25, 2011 Filing 156 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Strike Certificate #125 , Notice (Other) #140 Plaintiff's Expert Designation and Supplemental Designation #144 of Dr. Robert Pollard by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
May 24, 2011 Filing 155 INDEX in support of MOTION to Strike Certificate #148 Plaintiff's Designation of Dr. Carolyn Stern and Dr. Christpoher Moreland #153 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 3)(Moore, Scott)
May 24, 2011 Filing 154 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Strike Certificate #148 Plaintiff's Designation of Dr. Carolyn Stern and Dr. Christpoher Moreland #153 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
May 24, 2011 Filing 153 MOTION to Strike Certificate #148 Plaintiff's Designation of Dr. Carolyn Stern and Dr. Christpoher Moreland by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
May 20, 2011 Filing 152 INDEX in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert designation and Supplemental Report by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit #A1, #3 Exhibit #A2, #4 Exhibit #A3, #5 Exhibit #A4, #6 Exhibit #A5, #7 Exhibit #A6, #8 Exhibit #A7, #9 Exhibit #A8, #10 Exhibit #A9, #11 Exhibit #A10)(DeLair, Dianne)
May 20, 2011 Filing 151 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Strike Certificate #125 , Notice (Other) #140 Plaintiff's Expert Designation and Supplemental Designation #144 Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Designation and Supplemental Expert Report by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
May 17, 2011 Filing 150 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Peter J. Seiler (Amended) by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University (Moore, Scott)
May 16, 2011 Filing 149 Certificate of Service by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
May 13, 2011 Filing 148 Certificate of Service Plaintiff's Supplemental Rule 26 (a)(1) Disclosures by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
May 13, 2011 Filing 147 Certificate of Service Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
May 11, 2011 Filing 146 INDEX in support of MOTION to Strike Certificate #125 , Notice (Other) #140 Plaintiff's Expert Designation and Supplemental Designation #144 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, A1-A3)(Moore, Scott)
May 11, 2011 Filing 145 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Strike Certificate #125 , Notice (Other) #140 Plaintiff's Expert Designation and Supplemental Designation #144 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
May 11, 2011 Filing 144 MOTION to Strike Certificate #125 , Notice (Other) #140 Plaintiff's Expert Designation and Supplemental Designation by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
May 11, 2011 Filing 143 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Peter J. Seiler by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University (Moore, Scott)
May 11, 2011 Filing 142 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mydge Heaney by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University (Moore, Scott)
May 5, 2011 Filing 141 Certificate of Service by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
May 4, 2011 Filing 140 NOTICE of Supplementation by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (DeLair, Dianne)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting #123 Motion to Extend; granting #131 Motion to Extend. Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2011 at 11:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
March 28, 2011 Filing 138 Certificate of Service Plaintiff's Answers and Objections to Defendant's Second Request for Production of Documents by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
March 28, 2011 Filing 137 INDEX in opposition to MOTION to Extend Progression Order #131 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Scott P. Moore, #2 Exhibit A1 and A2)(Moore, Scott)
March 28, 2011 Filing 136 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Extend Progression Order #131 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
March 25, 2011 Filing 135 NOTICE Of Withdrawal of Second Set of Interrogatories by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University (Moore, Scott)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 TEXT ORDER regarding #123 Joint Motion to Extend and regarding #131 Motion to Extend. These motions regarding progression deadlines will be heard during a telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2011 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. The conference will be by telephone call initiated by plaintiff's counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
March 23, 2011 Filing 133 INDEX in support of MOTION to Extend Progression Order #131 by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Declaration of Dianne D. DeLair, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, E-mail, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, Declaration of Mary C. Vargas, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, E-mail string)(DeLair, Dianne)
March 22, 2011 Filing 132 BRIEF in support of Motion to Extend Progression Order by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
March 22, 2011 Filing 131 MOTION to Extend Progression Order by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
March 21, 2011 Filing 130 Second Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint #26 and Affirmative Defenses by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University(Moore, Scott)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 TEXT ORDER granting #128 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer to Amended Complaint. Amended pleading due 3/25/2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
March 21, 2011 Filing 128 Unopposed MOTION for Leave To File Second Amended Answer to Amended Complaint by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Second Amended Answer to Amended Complaint)(Moore, Scott)
March 14, 2011 Filing 127 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for in chambers proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett on 3/14/2011. Counsel appeared telephonically. Mary Vargas and Dianne DeLair represented the plaintiff and Scott P. Moore represented the defendant. Reviewed progression of the case and joint motion to extend. Counsel to submit a revised proposed order. (ARL,)
March 9, 2011 Filing 126 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Temporary Restraining Order proceeding before District Judge Laurie Smith Camp held on August 25, 2010. Pages 1-85. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or brendafauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. Redaction Request due 3/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2011. (BLF)
March 7, 2011 Filing 125 Certificate of Service Expert Witness Report by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 TEXT ORDER regarding #123 Motion to Extend. A Planning Conference is set for 3/14/2011 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett, to be held by telephone call initiated by plaintiff's counsel. A joint proposed order with the requested deadlines should be submitted before the hearing. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, ) Modified on 3/2/2011 to add the word "text". (GJG, ).
February 28, 2011 Filing 123 Joint MOTION to Extend by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
February 25, 2011 Filing 122 REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on August 25, 2010 before District Judge Laurie Smith Camp by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 TEXT ORDER granting #120 Joint Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines. Plaintiffs deadline to file his Expert Report is extended to 2/28/2011; Defendant shall serve its statement of the expert witnesses it expects totestify no later than 3/28/2011; Plaintiff shall disclose rebuttal experts no later than 4/7/2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
February 16, 2011 Filing 120 Joint MOTION to Extend the Expert Disclosure Deadlines as Set in the Court's Order on Motion to Extend #119 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #118 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Depositions to be completed by 4/22/2011, motions for summary judgment are due 5/1/2011. Expert deadlines extended as requested. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
January 20, 2011 Filing 118 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines as Set Forth in the Court's Order on Motion to Extend #117 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #116 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Deposition deadline extended to 3/29/2011. Other deadlines are extended as requested. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
January 6, 2011 Filing 116 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to File Expert Reports by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Expert witness deadlines extended as requested. Deposition deadline extended to 3/15/2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
December 6, 2010 Filing 114 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to File Expert Reports by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF A CIVIL CASE - Depositions due 2/28/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2011 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 7/12/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 TEXT ORDER granting #110 Motion for Leave. An amended progression order will be issued. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL,)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 TEXT ORDER regarding #110 Motion for Leave. A conference with Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett is set for Friday, 11/5/2010 at 11:30 A.M., to be held by telephone call initiated by plaintiff's counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
November 4, 2010 Filing 110 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Designate Additional Expert Witness by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 TEXT ORDER granting Joint Motion to Extend Deposition Deadline #108 . The deposition deadline is extended from 10/25/2010 to 11/5/2010. The deadline for filing motions in limine to exclude expert testimony is extended to 11/22/2010. All other deadlines established in Order #77 remain in effect. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
October 25, 2010 Filing 108 Joint MOTION to Extend Deposition Deadline by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
October 22, 2010 Filing 107 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Robert Coleman by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (DeLair, Dianne)
October 22, 2010 Filing 106 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Floyd Knoop by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (DeLair, Dianne)
October 22, 2010 Filing 105 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Tom Quinn by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (DeLair, Dianne)
October 22, 2010 Filing 104 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Christy Rentmeester by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (DeLair, Dianne)
October 22, 2010 Filing 103 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Kavan by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (DeLair, Dianne)
October 22, 2010 Filing 102 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Thomas Hansen by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (DeLair, Dianne)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion #100 to Withdraw Notice of Deposition for Amy Bones is granted. The Notice of Deposition #56 is deemed withdrawn. Defendant's Motion to Quash and for a Protective Order #87 is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
October 14, 2010 Filing 100 MOTION to Withdraw Document Notice of Deposition by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
October 14, 2010 Filing 99 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Okamoto (Amended) by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University (Moore, Scott)
October 14, 2010 Filing 98 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint #26 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University(Moore, Scott)
October 6, 2010 Filing 97 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Douglas D. Backhous, M.D. by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University (Moore, Scott)
October 6, 2010 Filing 96 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Amanda Mogg by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University (Moore, Scott)
October 6, 2010 Filing 95 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Okamoto by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University (Moore, Scott)
October 6, 2010 Filing 94 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brit Thedinger, M.D. by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University (Moore, Scott)
October 6, 2010 Filing 93 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gail D. Peoples by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University (Moore, Scott)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #79 Motion for leave to file an amended answer and affirmative defenses. Defendant shall file and serve the amended pleading no later than 10/13/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
October 4, 2010 Filing 91 INDEX in support of MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint #79 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Moore, Scott)
October 4, 2010 Filing 90 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint #79 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
October 1, 2010 Filing 89 INDEX in support of MOTION to Quash and MOTION for Protective Order #87 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Moore, Scott)
October 1, 2010 Filing 88 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Quash and MOTION for Protective Order #87 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
October 1, 2010 Filing 87 MOTION to Quash and, MOTION for Protective Order by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
September 30, 2010 Filing 86 INDEX - Exhibits regarding Index #85 by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne) Modified on 10/1/2010 to correct text. (JAB)
September 30, 2010 Filing 85 INDEX in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Amend Answer by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
September 30, 2010 Filing 84 BRIEF in opposition to Defendant's Motion To Amend Answer by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
September 28, 2010 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Christopher R. Hedican on behalf of Defendant Creighton University (Hedican, Christopher)
September 16, 2010 Filing 82 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rule 30(b)(6) by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (DeLair, Dianne)
September 16, 2010 Filing 81 INDEX in support of MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint #79 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 5)(Moore, Scott)
September 16, 2010 Filing 80 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint #79 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
September 16, 2010 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Unsigned Amended Answer)(Moore, Scott)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 TEXT ORDER. To correct a typographical error, Paragraph 4 of Order #77 is amended to provide that the final pretrial conference is continued from December 6, 2010 to February 24, 2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #73 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines, amending the Final Progression Order #32 . Jury Trial continued to 3/15/2011 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Final Pretrial Conference continued to 2/24/2011 at 1:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. Other deadlines extended as requested. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TEXT ORDER granting #75 Motion for Protective Order. The terms of Protective Order #74 remain in effect. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
September 9, 2010 Filing 75 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PROTECTIVE ORDER, granting #71 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
September 9, 2010 Filing 73 Joint MOTION to Extend Progression Order Deadlines and Lift Stay by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
September 9, 2010 Filing 72 TEXT NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY by Deputy Clerk that the Motion for Protective Order #71 has been filed and is considered deficient because the document is not signed. The plaintiff shall correct the deficiency within 15 days of the date of this entry or the pleading may be stricken from the record of this case. See NECivR 11.1.(ADB, )
September 8, 2010 Filing 71 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 27, 2010 Filing 70 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Michael S. Stein for Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JAB)
August 27, 2010 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Michael S. Stein on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (JAB)
August 26, 2010 Filing 68 EXHIBIT RECEIPT regarding Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. Exhibits from 8/25/2010 hearing returned. (JAB)
August 25, 2010 Filing 67 WITNESS LIST from hearing held On 8/25/2010. (ETC)
August 25, 2010 Filing 66 EXHIBIT LIST from hearing held on 8/25/2010. (ETC)
August 25, 2010 Filing 65 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Laurie Smith Camp denying #59 Motion for TRO; Motion Hearing held on 8/25/2010 regarding MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Relief #59 ; Hearing held in Omaha. Courtroom Deputy: Ed Champion; Reporter: Brenda Fauber; Appearance for Plaintiff: Dianne D. DeLair and Marcy C. Vargas (by phone): Appearance for Defendant: Scott P. Moore; Time Start: 2:04 p.m. Time Stop: 4:25 p.m. (ETC)
August 24, 2010 Filing 64 INDEX in opposition to MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Relief #59 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-11, #3 Exhibit 12-13)(Moore, Scott)
August 24, 2010 Filing 63 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Relief #59 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Relief #59 : Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ETC)
August 23, 2010 Filing 61 INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Relief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declarartion of Dianne D. DeLair, #2 Exhibit Exhibits #1-#7)(DeLair, Dianne)
August 23, 2010 Filing 60 BRIEF in support of Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Relief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 23, 2010 Filing 59 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Relief by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Joint Motion for Stay Pending Mediation. The case is stayed until and including 9/1/2010. Pursuant to General Order 2005-21, defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses #50 is denied, without prejudice to reassertion if the mediation is not successful. Status report due 9/1/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
August 17, 2010 Filing 57 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Progression Deadlines Pending Mediation by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
August 12, 2010 Filing 56 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Amy Bones by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (DeLair, Dianne)
August 11, 2010 Filing 55 NOTICE to Take Deposition of To be designated by Defendant pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (DeLair, Dianne)
August 11, 2010 Filing 54 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to marc.charmatz@nad.org regarding Certificate #53 . Mail/E-mail resent to marc.charmatz@nad.org. The email box was full. (CCB)
August 5, 2010 Filing 53 Certificate of Service Plaintiff's Supplemental Answers to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
August 4, 2010 Filing 52 INDEX in support of MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint #50 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Scott P. Moore, #2 Exhibit 1 - 5)(Moore, Scott)
August 4, 2010 Filing 51 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint #50 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
August 4, 2010 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Unsigned Amended Answer)(Moore, Scott)
August 2, 2010 Filing 49 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Kavan by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (DeLair, Dianne)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Extend Deadline. Defendant is given an extension of time until and including August 13, 2010 in which to serve its expert disclosures and reports. Plaintiff is granted an extension of time to September 3, 2010 in which to disclose rebuttal experts. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ORDER regarding #44 , Defendant's Motion to Extend Deadlines. Any responses in opposition shall be filed no later than 12:00 noon on Friday, July 16, 2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
July 9, 2010 Filing 46 INDEX in support of MOTION to Extend Time for Defendant to Serve Expert Disclosures and Reports #44 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1 and A2)(Moore, Scott)
July 9, 2010 Filing 45 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Extend Time for Defendant to Serve Expert Disclosures and Reports #44 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
July 9, 2010 Filing 44 MOTION to Extend Time for Defendant to Serve Expert Disclosures and Reports by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
June 24, 2010 Filing 43 Certificate of Service Plaintiff's Supplemental Responses to Defendant's Request for Production of Documents and Supplemental Response to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
June 18, 2010 Filing 42 Certificate of Service Plaintiff's Disclosure of Expert Witness Reports by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline. The time to file Discovery Motions is extended to September 10, 2010. All other existing deadlines remain in effect. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
June 18, 2010 Filing 40 Joint MOTION to Extend Time for Parties to file Discovery Motions by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
June 18, 2010 Filing 39 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Kavan by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (DeLair, Dianne)
June 18, 2010 Filing 38 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Wade Pearson by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (DeLair, Dianne)
June 9, 2010 Filing 37 Certificate of Service by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ORDER granting #35 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline. All expert witness disclosure deadlines in paragraph 3 of the Final Progression Order #32 are extended for a period of 14 days. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
June 4, 2010 Filing 35 MOTION to Extend Time to File Plaintiff's Expert Reports by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
May 27, 2010 Filing 34 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff, Michael S. Argenyi, by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University (Moore, Scott)
April 8, 2010 Filing 33 Certificate of Service Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Defendant by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF A CIVIL CASE - Depositions due 9/10/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2010 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 1/18/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (ARL, )
March 29, 2010 Filing 31 Certificate of Service Answers to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff and Request for Production of Documents by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
February 26, 2010 Filing 30 Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
February 26, 2010 Filing 29 Certificate of Service of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
February 2, 2010 Filing 28 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #26 and Affirmative Defenses by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University(Moore, Scott)
January 22, 2010 Filing 27 Certificate of Service by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
January 21, 2010 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Creighton University, by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Michael S. Argenyi(DeLair, Dianne)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #23 and #24 Motions to Amend Complaint, upon the representation that the motion is unopposed. Amended Complaint due by 1/26/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
January 20, 2010 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint #1 by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
January 15, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(DeLair, Dianne)
January 15, 2010 Filing 22 Certificate of Service Rule 26 (a)(1) Disclosures by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR INITIAL PROGRESSION OF A CIVIL CASE - Planning Conference set for 4/1/2010 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. Counsel for plaintiff(s) shall initiate the planning conference call to the court at 10:00 AM on 4/1/2010. Counsel shall notify the undersigned magistrate judge by joint or separate letters by 1/15/2010 addressing mediation requirements. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
November 30, 2009 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi.(DeLair, Dianne)
November 27, 2009 Filing 19 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Creighton University. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JAE, )
November 18, 2009 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University(Moore, Scott)
October 23, 2009 Filing 17 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Marc Charmatz for Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copies mailed as directed)(KBJ)
October 23, 2009 Filing 16 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Mary C. Vargas for Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copies mailed as directed)(KBJ)
October 14, 2009 Filing 15 TEXT NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY by Deputy Clerk that the Notice of Appearance #11 has been filed and is considered deficient due to no certificate of service. The plaintiff shall correct the deficiency within 15 days of the date of this entry or the pleading may be stricken from the record of this case. See NECivR 5.4(c) regarding certificates of service.(KBJ) Satisfied on 10/22/2009 (KBJ).
October 14, 2009 Filing 14 TEXT NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY by Deputy Clerk that the Notice of Appearance #10 has been filed and is considered deficient due to no certificate of service. The plaintiff shall correct the deficiency within 15 days of the date of this entry or the pleading may be stricken from the record of this case. See NECivR 5.4(c) regarding certificates of service.(KBJ) Satisfied on 10/22/2009 (KBJ).
October 14, 2009 Filing 13 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Marc Charmatz has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KBJ)
October 14, 2009 Filing 12 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Mary C. Vargas has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KBJ)
October 13, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Marc Charmatz on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (KBJ) #1 Certificate of Service) (KBJ, ). Modified on 10/23/2009 to reflect certificate of service filed on 10/22/09 (KBJ).
October 13, 2009 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Mary C. Vargas on behalf of Plaintiff Michael S. Argenyi (KBJ) #1 Certificate of Service) (KBJ, ). Modified on 10/23/2009 to reflect certificate of service filed on 10/22/09 (KBJ).
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING PACKET Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/30/2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
October 7, 2009 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Creighton University answer due 11/18/2009. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KBJ)
October 7, 2009 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Creighton University.(Moore, Scott)
September 29, 2009 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Creighton University on 9/28/2009. (DeLair, Dianne)
September 24, 2009 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Creighton University. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL )
September 24, 2009 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (DeLair, Dianne)
September 24, 2009 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (DeLair, Dianne)
September 24, 2009 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett assigned. (TCL )
September 24, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Creighton University ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 08670000000001607777), by Attorney Dianne D. DeLair on behalf of Michael S Argenyi(DeLair, Dianne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argenyi v. Creighton University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creighton University
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Represented By: Allison D. Balus
Represented By: Scott P. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States
Represented By: William F. Lynch
Represented By: Laurie A. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Argenyi
Represented By: Michael S. Stein
Represented By: Mary C. Vargas
Represented By: Marc Charmatz
Represented By: Caroline E. Jackson
Represented By: Dianne D. DeLair
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?