Turner v. Houston
Petitioner: David Jose Turner
Respondent: Robert Houston
Case Number: 8:2009cv00351
Filed: October 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 20 Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration. The court has carefully reviewed Petitioner's Motion and finds no good cause for reconsideration of any portion of its June 9, 2010, Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Turner has not submitted any argument or evidence which shows that he, or his counsel, were objectively impeded from filing all of his claims in his petition for further review to the Nebraska Supreme Court. Thus, Turner's claims are dismissed. Therefore, Turner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Petition (filing no. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that all three of Petitioner's claims are potentially cognizable in federal court. The Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the Petition to Respondents and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By January 8, 2010, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The C lerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 8, 2010: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 7, 2010: check for respondent to file answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy to pro se party and Copies mailed as directed)(GJG)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner is relieved from paying the filing fee at this time. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Jose Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?