EFEREBO v. PRIME
Case Number: 8:2009cv00406
Filed: November 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:451 Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting in part 53 Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC's Motion in Limine, as follows: Plaintiff Elgin Eferebo is precluded, in limine, from presenting any statements, arguments, testimony, or evidence concerning Defendant Prime Therapeuti cs LLCs net worth, and To the extent the Motion is not otherwise rendered moot by the Order on Pretrial Conference (Filing No. 57 ), the Motion is denied, without prejudice to the Defendant raising its objections at the time of trial. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 33 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline extended to 6/21/2010. If it is not possible to submit a joint report, counsel shall submit separate reports no later than 6/21/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EFEREBO v. PRIME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?