United States of America v. Voyles
Case Number: 8:2009cv00431
Filed: December 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - This matter is before the court on the Petitioner's Notice of Dismissal 8 ; This matter be, and hereby is, dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear their own costs; it is FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for February 22, 2010 is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (Copies mailed to defendant)(KBJ)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Petitioner's motion for an extension of time to perfect service and motion for a continuance of the January 19, 2010 4 , hearing is granted. Respondent, Douglas Voyles, shall appear before the undersigned judge in the District Court of the United States for the District of Nebraska, in Courtroom No. 6, 2nd Floor, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska on the 22nd day of February 2010, at 3:00 P.M., to show cause why he should not be compelle d to comply with the IRS summonses. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Order, together with (1) Petitioner's Motion to Continue Hearing and for Extension of Time to Perfect Service [Filing No. 4]; (2) the Order dated December 7, 2009 [Fil ing No. 3]; and (3) the Petition to Enforce Internal Revenue Summonses and exhibits thereto [Filing No. 1], be personally served on Douglas Voyles by either a United States marshal, a deputy United States marshal, or by an official of the Internal Re venue Service who is hereby specially appointed for that purpose, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order and that proof of service as provided for in Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l) be filed with the Clerk of the District Court within five (5) busin ess days after such service upon Respondent. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the Respondent fails to appear herein or otherwise respond, the United States may move to hold the Respondent in contempt of an Order of this court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (TCL )
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The Respondent, Douglas Voyles, appear before the District Court of the United States for the District of Nebraska in that branch thereof presided over by the Honorable F. A. Gossett, Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 6(Omaha), on the 19th day of January 2010 at 10:30 A.M., to show cause why respondent should not be compelled to comply with the Internal Revenue Service summonses served on respondent on September 15, 2009. A copy of this Order, together with the petition and E xhibits thereto, be personally served on Douglas Voyles, by an official of the Internal Revenue Service within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/19/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (KBJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Voyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?