Hudson v. Houston
Case Number: 8:2009cv00438
Filed: December 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel (filing no. 9 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Petition, the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claim is potentially cognizable in federal court. The Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ) to Respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By January 24, 2010, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in su pport of an answer. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 24, 2010: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary ju dgment. If Respondent elects to file an answer, the procedures as set out in this memorandum and order shall be followed by Respondent and Petitioner. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 23, 2010: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as ordered).(GJG)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. After considering Petitioner's financial status as shown in the records of this court, provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis will be granted and Petitioner is relieved from paying the fee at this time. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?