Langford v. Alegent Health
Case Number: 8:2009cv00446
Filed: December 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Complaint (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice to reassertion in Case No. 8:09CV169. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - No later than March 1, 2010, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in Case No. 8:09CV169. The amended complaint shall contain all of the plaintiff's claims, including those presented in Case No. 8:09CV446. Any cla ims not contained in the amended complaint will be deemed abandoned. All further pleadings shall be filed in Case No. 8:09CV169. 2. in the event that the plaintiff files an amended complaint in accordance with this memorandum and order, Case No. 8:0 9CV446 will be dismissed. 3. the clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case managementdeadline in this case with the following text: March 1, 2010: deadline for the plaintiff to file amended complaint. 4. the clerk of the court is directed to cancel the deadlines in the courts November 30, 2009, progression order. 5. the plaintiffs Motions to Enlarge Progression Order Deadlines (Case No. 8:09CV169, filing nos. 18 and 28), are denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Clerk of the court is directed to reassign this matter from Chief United States District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon to Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. This matter remains assigned to the pro se docket.Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langford v. Alegent Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?