Peitzmeier v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2009cv00455
Filed: December 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 42 Motion to Extend. Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2012 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 1/24/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 40 Motion to Extend. Deposition deadline set for 4/22/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2011 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. The final progression order 24 is amended as requested. Jury Trial continued from 4/12/2011 to 6/21/2011, Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Final Pretrial Conference continued from 3/28/2011 to 5/16/2011 at 9:30 AM, in chambers, before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PROTECTIVE ORDER, granting 27 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peitzmeier v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?