McCarthy v. Fidelity Security Life Insurance Company, et al.
Case Number: 8:2010cv00010
Filed: January 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 the joint motion for extension; plaintiff shall have until October 4, 2010, to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss. The parties shall have until November 1, 2010, to submit their Rule 26(f) report. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Extend ; plaintiff shall have until September 20, 2010, to respond to defendants MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 43 and MOTION to Dismiss RICO and Breach of Contract Claims and Motion to Strike 46 . The parties shall have until October 18, 2010, to submit their Rule 26(f) report. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATED MOTION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Motion to Extend. Plaintiff shall have until August 30, 2010 to respond to the pending motions to dismiss; and The parties shall have until September 27, 2010, to submit their Rule 26(f) report. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 35 Motion for leave to file second amended complaint. Plaintiff shall have until 5/12/2010 to file a second amended class action complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarthy v. Fidelity Security Life Insurance Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?