McCroy v. Douglas County Corrections Center et al
Case Number: 8:2010cv00069
Filed: February 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee for Appeal (filing no. 16 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is permitted leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $6.75 by June 11, 2010, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. After payme nt of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution and to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed as directed)(TCL )
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Complaint (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. All pending Motions are denied as moot. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 2 is granted; Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $6.25 by March 25, 2010, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a writ ten motion; if the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case will be dismissed; after payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the m anner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court; the Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiffs institution; the Clerk of the c ourt is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: March 25, 2010: initial partial filing fee payment due; Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times and all parties are b ound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and by the court's Local Rules while this case is pending; Plaintiff shall review the "Notice Regarding Summons Forms" attached to this Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (copies mailed as directed)(CJP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCroy v. Douglas County Corrections Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?