Henderson v. E&K Trucking, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher M. Henderson
Defendant: E&K Trucking, Inc. and Jill S. Morrison
Case Number: 8:2010cv00098
Filed: March 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - After careful consideration, and upon the stipulations 103 of the parties, the Court does hereby ORDER this matter is dismissed with prejudice, and that each party shall bear their own attorneys fees and costs incurred in relation to this matter. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (AOA)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER upon notice of settlement, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal on or before December 12, 2011. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The trial previously scheduled is cancelled and all pending motions are hereby terminated upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED ORDER Setting Final Schedule for Progression of Civil Case. The Final Pretrial Conference with the undersigned magistrate judge is set for October 19, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. in chambers, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Trial is set to commence, at the court's call, during the week of November 14, 2011, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon and a jury. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TEL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. E&K Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E&K Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill S. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher M. Henderson
Represented By: Judith A. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?