United States of America v. $48,100.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $48,100.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 8:2010cv00110
Filed: March 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER TO WITHDRAW EXHIBITS - Counsel for parties, shall either 1) withdraw the following exhibits previously submitted in this matter within 14 calendar days of the date of this order, or 2) show cause why the exhibits should not be destroyed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 93 Motion to Withdraw Document, and withdrawing 80 Motion and 81 Motion to Amend. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER - The motion to permit Patrick Cavanaugh Brennan for leave to withdraw as counsel for Claimant, John R. Nelson, (filing no. 83 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Claimant's motion 77 is granted in its entirely with the exception of the hourly rate requested for attorney's fees. The requested hourly rate has been reduced from $375 to $275. The United States shall pay the Claimant $39,521.98 representing attorney's fees, non-taxable expenses, taxable costs, and interest. This amount shall be included in the judgment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG) Modified on 10/10/2014 to reflect, copy mailed to pro se party. (GJG).
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that this action is dismissed with prejudice. The United States government shall return $48,100.00 in United States currency or the equivalent in a check, plus legal interest measured since October 19, 2009, to the claimant John R. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER - Claimant's motion for an extension of time, (Filing No. 64 ) is granted. Claimant's Notice of Appeal shall be filed on or before April 17, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Complaint 1 filed by United States of America. The court finds the claimant the Currency was used or intended for use in illegal drug transactions. The money must be forfeited to the government. The claim of John R. Nelson against defendant $48,100 in U.S. Currency, (Filing No. 9 ) is denied and dismissed. Judgment will be entered in accordance with this memorandum and order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 47 Motion to Continue. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TEL)
July 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 45 Motion to Continue. Non-Jury Trial set for 8/20/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Plaintiff's Unopposed Oral Motion to continue trial. Non-Jury Trial continued to 6/15/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Oral Motion. Non-Jury Trial set for 4/4/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER granting 25 Motion to Continue. Non-Jury Trial set for 7/26/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/2011 at 10:00 AM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. The discovery and deposition deadline is May 31, 2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB, )
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for final disposition. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that counsel for the parties shall confer and, on or before July 1, 2010, they shall jointly file a Rule 26(f) Report. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $48,100.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $48,100.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?